EP4034297 - SRCC AS A CATALYTIC CARRIER FOR METAL SPECIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FTOUNI, Jamal Vordere Hauptgasse 86 4800 Zofingen / CH | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Glas, Holger Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20772326.3 | 23.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020EP76475 | Priority number, date | EP20190199746 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19199746 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058508 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034297 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/46, B01J23/52, B01J23/72, B01J23/745, B01J23/755, B01J23/42, B01J23/44, B01J37/02, B01J37/08, B01J37/16, B01J27/232, B01J35/00, B01J35/10, C07C51/235 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B01J23/462 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J27/232 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J37/088 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J23/42 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J23/44 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J23/52 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J23/72 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J23/745 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J23/755 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J35/30 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J35/613 (EP,CN,KR);
B01J35/615 (EP,CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | SRCC ALS KATALYTISCHER TRÄGER FÜR METALLSPEZIES | [2022/31] | English: | SRCC AS A CATALYTIC CARRIER FOR METAL SPECIES | [2022/31] | French: | SRCC EN TANT QUE SUPPORT CATALYTIQUE POUR ESPÈCES MÉTALLIQUES | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 31.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP3275537 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,13-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0076] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraphs [0118] - [0128] * * paragraph [0139] * * paragraphs [0169] - [0173] * * paragraphs [0187] - [0191] * * paragraph [0223]; claim - * [Y] 1-16 [I] 7-12; | [XP]EP3599223 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [XP] 1-6,16 * abstract ** paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0117]; claim -; table 1 *; | [Y] - DANG CHENGXIONG ET AL, "Syngas production by dry reforming of the mixture of glycerol and ethanol with CaCO3", JOURNAL OF ENERGY CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 43, doi:10.1016/J.JECHEM.2019.08.002, ISSN 2095-4956, (20190807), pages 90 - 97, (20190807), XP085926303 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 91, column l, paragraph l * * page 91, column r, paragraph 6 * * page 92, column l, paragraph 4 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 94, column l, paragraph l; figures 1, 2; tables 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jechem.2019.08.002 | [Y] - CHUNLI XU ET AL, "Insight into effect of acid/base nature of supports on selectivity of glycerol oxidation over supported Au-Pt bimetallic catalysts", APPLIED CATALYSIS B: ENVIRONMENTAL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150301), vol. 164, doi:10.1016/j.apcatb.2014.09.048, ISSN 0926-3373, pages 334 - 343, XP055679949 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 335, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * * page 339, column l, paragraph l - page 341, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 343, column l, paragraph 2; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcatb.2014.09.048 | [Y] - JEROEN TEN DAM ET AL, "Tuning selectivity of Pt/CaCOin glycerol hydrogenolysis A Design of Experiments approach", CATALYSIS COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CATCOM.2011.06.007, ISSN 1566-7367, (20110606), pages 1 - 5, (20110613), XP028257030 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, column r, paragraph 3 - page 2, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 2, column r, paragraph 3 - page 3, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 4, column r, paragraph l - page 5, column r, paragraph 2; figures 1, 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.catcom.2011.06.007 | by applicant | US5703254 | US5965480 | WO0039222 | US2004020410 | WO2004030813 | WO2004083316 | WO2005121257 | WO2009074492 | EP2264108 | EP2264109 | EP2371766 | EP2447213 | EP2524898 | WO2013142473 | WO2013190076 | EP2840065 | - GANE, P.A.C.KETTLE, J.P.MATTHEWS, G.P.RIDGWAY, C.J., "Void Space Structure of Compressible Polymer Spheres and Consolidated Calcium Carbonate Paper-Coating Formulations", Industrial and Engineering Chemistry Research, (19960000), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 1753 - 1764 |