EP3937775 - ACCELERATED, SIMULTANEOUS QUANTITATIVE AND NON-SYNTHETIC MULTI-CONTRAST IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York 412 Low Memorial Library 535 West 116th Street New York, NY 10027 / US | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAUGHAN, Jr, John Thomas 3227 Broadway New York, New York 10027 / US | 02 /
GEETHANATH, Sairam 3227 Broadway New York, New York 10027 / US | 03 /
JAMBAWALIKAR, Sachin R. 630 West 168th Street New York, New York 10032 / US | 04 /
POOJAR, Pavan New York / US | 05 /
QIAN, Enlin New York, New York / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
VAUGHAN, Jr, John Thomas New York, New York 10027 / US | ||
02 /
GEETHANATH, Sairam New York, New York 10027 / US | |||
03 /
JAMBAWALIKAR, Sachin R. New York, New York 10032 / US | |||
04 /
POOJAR, Pavan New York / US | |||
05 /
QIAN, Enlin New York, New York / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20773478.1 | 16.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020US22996 | Priority number, date | US201962819159P | 15.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962819159 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020190879 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3937775 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, G01R33/42, G01R33/44, G01R33/48, G01R33/54, G01R33/563 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/0042 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/7425 (EP);
G01R33/50 (EP);
G01R33/5602 (EP,US);
G01R33/561 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | BESCHLEUNIGTE, SIMULTANE QUANTITATIVE UND NICHTSYNTHETISCHE MULTIKONTRASTBILDGEBUNG | [2022/03] | English: | ACCELERATED, SIMULTANEOUS QUANTITATIVE AND NON-SYNTHETIC MULTI-CONTRAST IMAGING | [2022/03] | French: | IMAGERIE À CONTRASTES MULTIPLES, QUANTITATIVE ET NON SYNTHÉTIQUE, ACCÉLÉRÉE ET SIMULTANÉE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 13.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/47] | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - IMAM SHAIK ET AL., "Tailored Magnetic Resonance Fingerprinting: optimizing acquisition schedule and intelligent reconstruction using a block approach", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ISMRM, JOINT ANNUAL MEETING ISMRM-ESMRMB, PARIS, FRANCE, 16-21 JUNE 2018, (20180601), no. 2792, XP040702000 [X] 14 * the whole document * [I] 1-13,15 | [XI] - BHAIRAV BIPIN MEHTA ET AL, "Magnetic resonance fingerprinting: a technical review : Magnetic Resonance in Medicine", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, US, (20180914), vol. 81, no. 1, doi:10.1002/mrm.27403, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 25 - 46, XP055562942 [X] 14 * the whole document * [I] 1-5,9-13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.27403 | [T] - QIAN ENLIN ET AL, "Tailored magnetic resonance fingerprinting for simultaneous non-synthetic and quantitative imaging: A repeatability study", MEDICAL PHYSICS., US, vol. 49, no. 3, doi:10.1002/mp.15465, ISSN 0094-2405, (20220127), pages 1673 - 1685, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.1002/mp.15465, XP055977885 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mp.15465 | International search | [Y]US2014085318 (NADAR MARIAPPAN S [US], et al) [Y] 15, 16, 33, 34, 51, 52 * ; paragraphs [0009], [0032], [0055] *; | [XYA]US2017007148 (KADITZ JEFFREY HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 13, 14, 19-21, 31, 32, 37-39, 49, 50 * ; paragraphs [0104], [0113], [0117] * [Y] 4-7, 12, 15, 16, 18, 22-25, 30, 33, 34, 36, 40-43, 48, 51, 52, 54 [A] 8-11, 17, 26-29, 35, 44-47, 53; | [Y]US2017082715 (CHOI JOON-SUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 4-7, 12, 22-25, 30, 40-43, 48 * ; paragraphs [0175], [0211] *; | [Y]WO2018108643 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 18, 36, 54* ; page 3 lines 13-19, page 6 lines 15-24 * |