EP3967690 - PYRROLE AMIDOPYRIDONE COMPOUND, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Ringene BioPharma Co., Ltd. Room 305, 3rd Floor No.866 Halei Road, China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAN, Huixin No.888 Zhujiang Road Juegang Town, Rudong County Nantong, Jiangsu 226499 / CN | 02 /
PAN, Jianfeng No.888 Zhujiang Road Juegang Town, Rudong County Nantong, Jiangsu 226499 / CN | 03 /
MA, Jingui No.888 Zhujiang Road Juegang Town, Rudong County Nantong, Jiangsu 226499 / CN | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Calysta NV Lambroekstraat 5a 1831 Diegem / BE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20773591.1 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020CN78963 | Priority number, date | CN201910200772 | 17.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910200772 | CN20191173573 | 06.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911073573 | [2022/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020187123 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967690 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61K31/538, A61K31/5386, A61K31/4523, A61K31/454, A61K31/496, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P37/00, A61P29/00, A61P37/06, A61P11/02, A61P17/14, A61P25/28, A61P9/10, A61P11/06, A61P19/02, A61P17/00, A61P37/08, A61P1/16 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A61P1/00 (EP,CN);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (KR);
A61K31/4545 (KR);
A61K31/538 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP,CN);
A61P1/18 (EP,CN);
A61P11/00 (EP,CN);
A61P11/02 (EP,CN);
A61P11/06 (EP,CN);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP,CN);
A61P13/12 (EP,CN);
A61P17/00 (EP,CN);
A61P17/06 (EP,CN);
A61P17/14 (EP,CN);
A61P19/02 (EP,CN);
A61P19/06 (EP,CN);
A61P21/00 (EP,CN);
A61P21/04 (EP,CN);
A61P25/00 (EP,CN);
A61P25/16 (EP,CN);
A61P25/28 (EP,CN);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN);
A61P3/10 (EP,CN);
A61P31/10 (EP,CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP,CN);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP,CN);
A61P37/06 (EP,CN);
A61P37/08 (EP,CN);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP,CN);
A61P7/06 (EP,CN);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | PYRROLAMIDOPYRIDONVERBINDUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/11] | English: | PYRROLE AMIDOPYRIDONE COMPOUND, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF | [2022/11] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE PYRROLE AMIDOPYRIDONE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2021 | Translation filed | 12.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/11] | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2022/11] | 21.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 22.11.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.12.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2015164480 (INCYTE CORP [US]) [X] 1 * pages 117-119; examples 1-4; claim 1 *; | [E]WO2020092638 (NUVATION BIO INC [US]) [E] 1-3,12 * page 78; examples 268 , 269 ** Formula (Vc-7); page 48 * | International search | [X]WO2014125408 (AURIGENE DISCOVERY TECH LTD [IN]) [X] 1-15 * Description, examples 5-9, 19, pages 3-21, Claims 1-21 *; | [X]CN104136435 (ABBVIE INC) [X] 1-15 * Description, examples 69-73, 252-257, 269, 327, 337-339, Paragraphs 2-207, Claims 1-63 *; | [X]US2015148372 (YUE EDDY W [US], et al) [X] 1-15* Abstract, Description, pages 12-27, Claims 1-42, examples 1-2, examples A1, B1, C1 *; | [X]CN105026403 (ABBVIE INC) [X] 1, 11, 14 * Description, examples 58, 127, 194, 208, 239, 272 *; | [X]CN105531273 (ABBVIE INC) [X] 1-15 * Description, examples 119-124, 133, 135, 143-148, 150-152, 157-158, 164, 187, Paragraphs 2-13, 169-231, Claims 1-39 *; | [X]CN108069958 (KAIHUI SCIENCE & TECH DEVELOPMENT SHANGHAI CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-15 * Description, Paragraphs 288-317, 822-891, Claims 1-10 *; | [X]CN109071534 (ABBVIE INC) [X] 1-15 * Description, examples 1, 3, 5, 28, 30-36, 38, 40-42, 49, 53-55, 57, 59-60, 63-75, 81-88, 90, 98-99, 104-108, 110-123, 126-129, Paragraphs 2-13, 126-195, Claims 1-37 *; | [PX]CN110041253 (SHANGHAI HANSOH BIOMEDICAL CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-15 * Description, Paragraphs 131-148, 1353-1424, examples 63-67 *; | [PX]CN110143961 (JIANGSU PROVINCIAL ACAD TRADITIONAL CHINESE MED, et al) [PX] 1-15 * Description, examples 1-14, Paragraphs 6-85 *; | [PX]CN110204543 (JIANGSU PROVINCIAL ACAD TRADITIONAL CHINESE MED, et al) [PX] 1-15 * Description, examples 1-10, Paragraphs 6-90 *; | [PX]WO2020020288 (CHIA TAI TIANQING PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al) [PX] 1-15 * Description, examples 7, 10, 13-14, 22, Pages 1-13 * | by applicant | WO2017177955 | - GREENWALD, R. B. et al., J. Med. Chem., (20000000), vol. A, B, page 475 | - Chiral Separations, Methods and Protocols, Methods in Molecular Biology, (20040000), vol. 243 | - A.M. STALCUP, Chiral Separations, Annu. Rev. Anal. Chem., (20100000), vol. 3, pages 341 - 63 | - VOGEL'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF PRACTICAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY 5.sup.TH ED., Longman Scientific and Technical Ltd., (19910000), pages 809 - 816 | - Heller, Acc. Chem. Res., (19900000), vol. 23, page 128 | - SAULNIER, M. G. et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (19940000), vol. 4, pages 1985 - 1990 | CN20191173573 |