EP3941763 - EFFECTIVE TIRE PRESSURE SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC 200 4th Avenue South Nashville, TN 37201 / US | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STALNAKER, David O. 9168 Carissa Drive Brentwood, Tennessee 37027 / US | 02 /
PALMER, Robert 2415 Windemere Drive Murfreesboro, Tennessee 37128 / US | 03 /
RUTHERFORD, Kirk S. 1009 Somerset Downs Blvd. Hendersonville, Tennessee 37075 / US | 04 /
MARTINEZ, Cameron C. 3855 Stewarts Ferry Pike Nashville, Tennessee 37122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
STALNAKER, David O. Brentwood, Tennessee 37027 / US | ||
02 /
PALMER, Robert Murfreesboro, Tennessee 37128 / US | |||
03 /
RUTHERFORD, Kirk S. Hendersonville, Tennessee 37075 / US | |||
04 /
MARTINEZ, Cameron C. Nashville, Tennessee 37122 / US | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20774322.0 | 12.02.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020US17927 | Priority number, date | US201962821258P | 20.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962821258 P | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020190430 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3941763 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04, B60S5/04 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
B60C23/0479 (EP,US);
B60C23/0486 (US);
B60C23/002 (US);
B60C23/0476 (EP);
G07C5/0808 (EP);
G07C5/0825 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | B60C23/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR EFFEKTIVEN REIFENDRUCKERFASSUNG | [2022/04] | English: | EFFECTIVE TIRE PRESSURE SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2022/04] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE LA PRESSION EFFECTIVE D'UN PNEU | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 20.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007113635 (CORNIOT PHILIPPE [FR]) [Y] 4-7,11 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0117]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2008042817 (FOGELSTROM KENNETH A [US]) [Y] 8-10* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-8 *; | [XY]EP2142389 (SCHRADER ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,12-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-10 * [Y] 4-11 | International search | [YX]US2015005982 (MUTHUKUMAR PRASAD [IN]) [Y] 19-20 [X] 1-18; | [Y]US2017217261 (MAYS WESLEY M [US], et al) [Y] 19-20; | [A]CN107074044 (ALLIGATOR VENTILFAB GMBH)[A] 1-20; | [A]KR20180048073 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20; | [A]JP2018522779 [A] 1-20 |