EP3943376 - SERIAL HYBRID MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI Takafumi c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
KINOSHITA Ryosuke c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
SAITO Hibiki c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
INO Satoshi c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA Hiroyuki c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI Takafumi Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
KINOSHITA Ryosuke Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
SAITO Hibiki Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
INO Satoshi Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
TANAKA Hiroyuki Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20774465.7 | 18.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020JP11921 | Priority number, date | JP20190050895 | 19.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019050895 | [2022/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020189708 | Date: | 24.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943376 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62M7/12, B62M23/02, B60K6/42 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B62K11/10 (EP);
B60K11/02 (EP);
B60K6/46 (EP);
B62J11/19 (EP);
B62J41/00 (EP);
B62J43/16 (EP);
B62J50/30 (EP);
B62M23/02 (EP);
B62M7/12 (EP);
B60K2001/005 (EP);
B60K2001/008 (EP);
B60W2300/36 (EP);
B60Y2200/12 (EP);
B60Y2200/92 (EP);
B60Y2400/302 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | B62M7/12, B62M23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | SERIELLES HYBRIDMOTORRAD | [2022/04] | English: | SERIAL HYBRID MOTORCYCLE | [2022/04] | French: | MOTOCYCLETTE HYBRIDE DE SÉRIE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | Translation filed | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 26.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2007209188 (IKEDO YOSETSU SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5,8; | [A]CN201086632Y (ZHENPING LI [CN])[A] 1; | [YA]US2012103710 (ATSUCHI MICHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,8 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0099]; figures 1-6 * [A] 1; | [A]US2017113634 (TANAKA JUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,8 | International search | [Y]JP2005143169 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0017]-[0045], 1-6 *; | [A]JP3660466B (YAMAHA MOTOR CO., LTD.) [A] 6-7 * paragraphs [0058]-[0063], fig. 11-13 *; | [Y]JP2011201398 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 2-4 * paragraph [0062] *; | [Y]JP2012171451 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0021]-[0075], fig. 1 *; | [Y]JP2012196979 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0018]-[0021], fig. 1 *; | [XY]JP2015085797 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0013]-[0040], fig. 1-3 paragraphs [0013]-[0040], fig. 1-3 * [Y] 8; | [Y]JP2017140932 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0030]-[0031], fig. 5-6 *; | [A] - WU, YUH-YIN et al., "Design, Modeling and Development of a Serial Hybrid Motorcycle with HCCI Engine", Advances in Automobile Engineering, (20130904), vol. 2, no. 2, doi:10.4172/2167-7670.1000104, ISSN 2167-7670, pages 1 - 8, XP055741403 [A] 1-8 * , entire text, entire chart * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4172/2167-7670.1000104 | [A] - Jumpei OMORI, Isao SHOKAKU, Keishi TAKAYAMA, "Development of 2018 model PCX and PCX HYERD", Honda R&D Technical Review, JP, (20190301), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 2187-381X, pages 40 - 47, XP009530966 [A] 1-8 | [A] - Anonymous, "PCX HYBRID Product Manual", JP, (20180700), pages 1 - 138, Honda Motor Co Ltd. , URL: https://2rom-prd-data.hondamotopub.com/om/HMJ/PCX%20HYBRID/2018/PCXHYBRID_30K96B00_0.pdf, XP009530970 [A] 1-8 | [A] - Anonymous, "PCX HYBRID Parts Catalog", HONDA MOTOR - PCX HYBRID Parts Catalog, JP, (20180901), pages 24 - 87, XP009532042 [A] 1-8 | [PA] - SHEIKH, AHMED ZIA, "Comparative Analysis of Parallel vs Series Hybrid Electric Powertrains", Theses, Rochester Institute of Technology, NY, (20190700), pages 1 - 51, 8-46, XP055741407 [PA] 2-6 | by applicant | JP2011016414 |