Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4041836
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
31.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
26.09.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
15.07.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.07.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
21.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for validation state |
|
08.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
06.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
28.09.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|