Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022348794 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP75392 | 10.09.2020 | DE202019105635 | 11.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114585702 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP75392 | 10.09.2020 | DE202019105635 | 11.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4041836 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP75392 | 10.09.2020 | DE202019105635 | 11.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021069174 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202019105635 | 11.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202019105635U | 27.11.2019 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202019105635 | 11.10.2019 |