EP4068984 - PLANT FOR PASTEURIZING FOODSTUFFS OR BEVERAGES FILLED INTO CLOSED CONTAINERS BY WAY OF A PROCESS LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUECKE, Jens Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
MUENZER, Jan Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20774922.7 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP75707 | Priority number, date | DE201910133184 | 05.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019133184 | [2022/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110296 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068984 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4068984 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/46, A23L3/00, A23L3/02, B65B55/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A23L2/46 (EP,US);
A23L3/02 (EP,US);
A23L3/003 (US);
Y02P60/85 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUM PASTEURISIEREN VON IN VERSCHLOSSENEN BEHÄLTNISSEN ABGEFÜLLTEN LEBENSMITTELN ODER GETRÄNKEN MIT EINER PROZESSFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2022/41] | English: | PLANT FOR PASTEURIZING FOODSTUFFS OR BEVERAGES FILLED INTO CLOSED CONTAINERS BY WAY OF A PROCESS LIQUID | [2022/41] | French: | INSTALLATION DE PASTEURISATION D'ALIMENTS OU DE BOISSONS INTRODUITS DANS DES RÉCIPIENTS FERMÉS AU MOYEN D'UN LIQUIDE DE TRAITEMENT | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19908035 (KHS MASCH & ANLAGENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [I]DE102007003976 (KHS AG [DE]) [I] 1-16 * Absätze 18-19; Ansprüche 1-8; Abbildung 1 *; | [ID]WO2017055501 (RED BULL GMBH [AT]) [ID] 1-16 * Ansprüche 1-15; Abbildung 1 *; | [ID]EP3378330 (RED BULL GMBH [AT]) [ID] 1-16 | by applicant | FR2520984 | DE102007003919 | JP2012166806 | WO2017055501 | EP3378330 |