EP4025593 - ALLOGENEIC CELL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poseida Therapeutics, Inc. 9390 Towne Centre Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERTAG, Eric M. c/o Poseida Therapeutics, Inc. 9390 Towne Centre Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
SHEDLOCK, Devon c/o Poseida Therapeutics, Inc. 9390 Towne Centre Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20775485.4 | 03.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020US49262 | Priority number, date | US201962896495P | 05.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962896495 P | US202062976536P | 14.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062976536 P | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021046261 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4025593 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C07K14/725 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/70507 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/70517 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/70521 (US);
C07K14/70578 (EP,IL,US);
C07K14/7155 (US);
C12N15/625 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,IL);
C07K2319/02 (KR,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ALLOGENER ZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2022/28] | English: | ALLOGENEIC CELL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE | [2022/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CELLULES ALLOGÉNIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 03.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2016127257 (UNIV HEALTH NETWORK [CA], et al) [Y] 1-21,41 * sequence 3 * * page 29, paragraph 85 * [A] 22-40; | [YA]WO2018170475 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US]) [Y] 1-21,41 * page 48, paragraph l - page 49, line 24 * * sequence 66 * [A] 22-40; | [IP]WO2020051374 (POSEIDA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [IP] 1-41 * figure 6 ** claim 34 *; | [A] - ANDREW PETERSON ET AL, "Monoclonal antibody and ligand binding sites of the T cell erythrocyte receptor (CD2)", NATURE, London, (19871001), vol. 329, no. 6142, doi:10.1038/329842a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 842 - 846, XP055762453 [A] 1-41 * abstract * * page 844; figure 2B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/329842a0 | by applicant | US3773919 | US4239754 | US4309989 | US4554101 | US4656134 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4704692 | US4766067 | US4767402 | US4795699 | US4800159 | US4889818 | US4921794 | US4925673 | US4939666 | US4946778 | US4965188 | US4994370 | WO9117271 | US5066584 | WO9118980 | WO9119818 | US5091310 | WO9205258 | US5122464 | US5130238 | US5142033 | WO9214843 | WO9216221 | US5168062 | WO9308278 | US5223409 | US5260203 | US5266491 | US5385839 | US5403484 | US5427908 | US5455030 | US5514670 | US5518889 | WO9619256 | US5534621 | US5571698 | US5576195 | US5580717 | US5580734 | US5595898 | US5618920 | US5641670 | US5643768 | US5656730 | US5658754 | US5693493 | US5698435 | US5698417 | US5733746 | US5733761 | US5750373 | US5763733 | US5767260 | US5770222 | US5770359 | US5814599 | US5827739 | US5837500 | US5839446 | WO9853847 | US5849695 | US5851198 | US5856456 | US5871753 | US5879681 | US5885793 | US6218182 | US6218185 | US6309663 | US6835394 | US6962810 | US7217427 | WO2010099296 | US7868512 | US8399643 | US8808748 | US2014363496 | US9228180 | US2017000743 | US2017107541 | US2017114149 | WO2018068022 | US2018187185 | US10041077 | WO2019049816 | US10329543 | WO2019126589 | US2019255191 | WO2019173636 | US10415024 | US10456452 | WO2019225667 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. BAD11135 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 195514-80-8 | - KUMARAN et al., Protein Sci, (19970000), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 2233 - 2241 | - CUNNINGHAMWELLS, Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - CAPELLAS et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (19970000), vol. 56, no. 4, pages 456 - 463 | - SMITH et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - PHILIP B et al., Blood, (20140821), vol. 124, no. 8, pages 1277 - 87 | - SPRAGUE et al., J. Virol., (19830000), vol. 45, pages 773 - 781 | - WERLEN et al., Bioconjugate Chem., (19940000), vol. 5, pages 411 - 417 | - DE VOS et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 255, pages 306 - 312 | - ITOH et al., Bioorg. Chem., (19960000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 59 - 68 | - FISCH et al., Bioconjugate Chem., (19920000), vol. 3, pages 147 - 153 | - KYTE et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19820000), vol. 157, pages 105 - 132 | - LEHNINGER, Biochemistry, Worth Publishers, Inc., (19750000), pages 71 - 77 | - TATUSOVAMADDEN, FEMS Microbiol Lett., (19990000), vol. 174, pages 247 - 250 | WO2019US49816 | WO2019US67758 |