EP4034743 - THREADED CONNECTION INCLUDING AND INTERMEDIATE SHOULDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vallourec Oil and Gas France 54 rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOTHERGILL, Alan c/o Vallourec Tubes, DPI 27 avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
DUFRENE, Corey c/o Vallourec Tubes, DPI 27 avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 03 /
MARUTA, Satoshi c/o Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20775632.1 | 22.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020EP76430 | Priority number, date | EP20190199254 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19199254 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021058481 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034743 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/042 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
E21B17/0423 (EP,CN,US);
F16L15/002 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | SCHRAUBVERBINDUNG MIT EINER ZWISCHENSCHULTER | [2022/31] | English: | THREADED CONNECTION INCLUDING AND INTERMEDIATE SHOULDER | [2022/31] | French: | RACCORD FILETÉ COMPRENANT UN ÉPAULEMENT INTERMÉDIAIRE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 14.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/01] | 29.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4795200 (TUNG LAWRENCE Y [US]) [A] 1-18* figures 1-3; claims 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2004262919 (DUTILLEUL PIERRE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0052] , [0 98] , [ 102] , [ 105] , [ 117] , [ 164] , [ 165] *; | [Y]WO2017097700 (VALLOUREC OIL & GAS FRANCE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 30]; figures 1-6; claims 1, 3 * |