EP3780561 - DOMAIN NAME CONFIGURATION AND DEPLOYMENT MANAGEMENT METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wangsu Science & Technology Co., Ltd. Building A Floor 5 GuangQi Culture Plaza No. 2899 Jia, Xietu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Jianrong Building A Floor 5 GuangQi Culture Plaza No. 2899 Jia Xietu Road, Xuhui District Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Würmser, Julian Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20775803.8 | 12.02.2020 | [2021/07] | WO2020CN74969 | Priority number, date | CN201910504882 | 12.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910504882 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020248613 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780561 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, H04L12/24, H04L29/08 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
H04L61/30 (EP);
H04L41/0813 (CN,US);
H04L41/082 (EP);
H04L61/4511 (CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOMÄNENNAMENKONFIGURATION SOWIE EINSATZVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | DOMAIN NAME CONFIGURATION AND DEPLOYMENT MANAGEMENT METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE CONFIGURATION ET DE DÉPLOIEMENT DE NOM DE DOMAINE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2020 | Translation filed | 01.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 10.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007203952 (BARON ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0047] *; | [A]CN104079438 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]US2018262351 (LIU BO [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0119] * | International search | [A]CN101478553 (CHINA NETCOM GROUP CORP [CN]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2017317973 (LAM JIMMY [CA], et al) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [X]CN108540583 (BEIJING SCIENCE & TECH CO THREE FAST ONLINE) [X] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0023]-[0106], and figures 1-3 *; | [PX]CN110278290 (WANGSU SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * |