EP4032327 - AUTOMATED ACCESS POINT MAPPING SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESAI, Vishal Satyendra 2654 Ramsdell Place San Jose, CA 95148 / US | 02 /
ZACKS, David John 404, 33 Water Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 1R4 / CA | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Warren, Caroline Elisabeth, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20776021.6 | 09.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020US49973 | Priority number, date | US201916575688 | 19.09.2019 Original published format: US201916575688 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021055210 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4032327 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4032327 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/33, G01S5/14, G01S11/06, // H04W84/22 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H04W4/33 (EP);
H04W16/20 (US);
G01S11/06 (EP);
G01S5/14 (EP);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04B17/364 (US);
H04L41/22 (US);
H04L43/0829 (US);
H04L43/0852 (US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W48/20 (US);
H04W8/005 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | H04W4/33, G01S5/02, H04W64/00, H04W84/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN ZUGRIFFSPUNKTABBILDUNG | [2022/30] | English: | AUTOMATED ACCESS POINT MAPPING SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2022/30] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE MAPPAGE DE POINTS D'ACCÈS AUTOMATISÉ | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013257657 (GARIN LIONEL JACQUES [US], et al); | [A]US2013324165 (FUJIWARA YAYOI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015045054 (EMADZADEH AMIR ABBAS [US], et al) |