EP4032175 - MODULAR MULTILEVEL CONVERTER PRE-CHARGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESTAS WIND SYSTEMS A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKHOU, Masoud Granvej 4 8450 Hammel / DK | 02 /
HELLE, Lars Hjedsbækvej 475 9541 Suldrup / DK | 03 /
GERÇEK, Cem Özgür Broloftet 28 8240 Risskov / DK | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20776067.9 | 17.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020DK50256 | Priority number, date | DK2019PA70576 | 19.09.2019 Original published format: DK PA201970576 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052546 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4032175 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/36, H02M7/483 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
H02J7/0016 (US);
H02J7/0019 (US);
H02M1/0067 (US);
H02M1/0095 (US);
H02M1/36 (EP,US);
H02M7/483 (EP,US);
H02M7/4833 (EP,US);
H02M7/4835 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (US);
H02J2207/50 (US);
H02J2300/28 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | MODULARE MEHRSTUFIGE KONVERTERVORLADUNG | [2022/30] | English: | MODULAR MULTILEVEL CONVERTER PRE-CHARGING | [2022/30] | French: | PRÉ-CHARGEMENT DE CONVERTISSEUR MODULAIRE MULTI-NIVEAUX | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 18.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2016211762 (CHENG ZHONGYUAN [CA], et al) [I] 1,4-7,10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0030] *; | [I] - KEYAN SHI ET AL, "A novel start-up scheme for modular multilevel converter", ENERGY CONVERSION CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION (ECCE), 2012 IEEE, IEEE, (20120915), doi:10.1109/ECCE.2012.6342255, ISBN 978-1-4673-0802-1, pages 4180 - 4187, XP032467086 [I] 1,4-7,9-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECCE.2012.6342255 |