Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3948977 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202080037278 EP20776593 US2020024981W US202017598812



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022190426Global Dossier 16.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202017598812 26.03.2020
WO2020US24981 26.03.2020
US201962825367 28.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN113826271Global Dossier 21.12.2021A
Priority number Date
WO2020US24981 26.03.2020
US201962825367 28.03.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3948977Global Dossier 12.06.2024A4
EP3948977 09.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
WO2020US24981 26.03.2020
US201962825367 28.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020198486Global Dossier 01.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962825367 28.03.2019