EP3944012 - OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRANO, Tomoya c/o STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13 Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
HIRANO, Tomoya Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | Representative(s) | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20777011.6 | 16.03.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020JP11538 | Priority number, date | JP20190055271 | 22.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019055271 | [2022/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020196054 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944012 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/155, G02F1/1506, G02F1/1516 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G02F1/1506 (EP,US);
G02F1/155 (EP,US);
G02F1/1516 (EP);
G02F1/1503 (US);
G02F1/1533 (US);
G02F2001/1517 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | G02F1/155, G02F1/1506 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES ELEMENT | [2022/04] | English: | OPTICAL ELEMENT | [2022/04] | French: | ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2021 | Translation filed | 22.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 07.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012062976 (BURDIS MARK SAMUEL [US]) [I] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0037] - [0049]; figures 3A, 3B *; | [I]US2013057939 (YEH LI-YA [DE], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0045] - [0058]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2018275476 (HIRANO TOMOYA [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2013519925 (SAINT GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0031]-[0054], fig. 1 *; | [A]CN107991824 (JIANG WEIDONG) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0017]-[0030], fig. 1-14 *; | [A]US2019004386 (BERGH SAM [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0049]-[0168], fig. 2A-19 *; | [PX]JP2019066619 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [PX] 1* , paragraphs [0055]-[0068], [0077]-[0097], fig. 4A, 4B, 4C, 6A, 6B, 6C * | by applicant | JP2004170613 | JP2007134143 | JP2012181389 |