Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3947699 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CA3131875 EP20777563 US2020024968W US202117482142



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022248619Global Dossier 11.08.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962824727 27.03.2019
US202117482142 22.09.2021
WO2020US24968 26.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3131875Global Dossier 01.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962824727 27.03.2019
WO2020US24968 26.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3947699Global Dossier 28.12.2022A4
EP3947699 09.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962824727 27.03.2019
WO2020US24968 26.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020198477Global Dossier 01.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962824727 27.03.2019