Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.12.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 | Change - classification | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
16.12.2022 | Change - classification | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
03.06.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
03.06.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
25.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.01.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] |
07.01.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] |
08.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.10.2021 | Change - representative | |
15.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.10.2021 | Change - representative | |
09.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.10.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
03.10.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.10.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |