EP3950823 - ORGANIC-FIBER-REINFORCED RESIN MOLDING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 6-4, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKURA, Yukihiro c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 6-4, Otemachi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
SATAKE, Mayu c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 6-4, Otemachi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Suzune c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 6-4, Otemachi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
NAKAJIMA, Yasuo c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 6-4, Otemachi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 05 /
SUYAMA, Kenichi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 6-4, Otemachi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 06 /
KIM, Jae Kyung c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 6-4, Otemachi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 07 /
TANAKA, Hiroki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 6-4, Otemachi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 08 /
TOMOMATSU, Isao c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 6-4, Otemachi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
IKURA, Yukihiro Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
02 /
SATAKE, Mayu Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
03 /
ITO, Suzune Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKAJIMA, Yasuo Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
05 /
SUYAMA, Kenichi Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
06 /
KIM, Jae Kyung Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
07 /
TANAKA, Hiroki Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | |||
08 /
TOMOMATSU, Isao Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20777872.1 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP13855 | Priority number, date | JP20190060606 | 27.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019060606 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020196800 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950823 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10, C08K7/02 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
B29B7/002 (EP,US);
C08J5/045 (US);
B29B7/286 (EP);
B29B7/726 (EP);
B29B7/82 (EP,US);
B29B7/90 (EP);
C08K7/02 (EP);
C08L23/10 (EP);
B29B7/183 (EP);
B29B7/42 (EP);
B29B7/46 (EP);
B29K2023/12 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K7/02, C08L23/10 (EP);
C08L23/10, C08K7/02, C08L51/06 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/06] | C08L23/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | MIT ORGANISCHER FASER VERSTÄRKTE HARZFORM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/06] | English: | ORGANIC-FIBER-REINFORCED RESIN MOLDING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2022/06] | French: | CORPS MOULÉ DE RÉSINE RENFORCÉ PAR DES FIBRES ORGANIQUES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2021 | Translation filed | 11.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 22.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2455421 (LION IDEMITSU COMPOSITES CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP3006492 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]); | [X]EP3263636 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]) | International search | [X]JP2007056176 (DAICEL POLYMER LTD, et al); | [X]JP2011208015 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [X]JP2013245343 (POLYMER ASSOCIATES KK, et al); | [X]WO2014196551 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2016136881 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP5762674B |