EP3948563 - TOPOLOGY DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S&C Electric Company 6601 N. Ridge Blvd. Chicago, Illinois 60626 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARON, Yoav Evanston, Illinois / US | 02 /
RARICK, James Chicago, Illinois / US | 03 /
OVERMYER, Amy Berwyn, Illinois / US | [2022/06] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20778005.7 | 23.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US24216 | Priority number, date | US201962823114P | 25.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962823114 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198142 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3948563 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3948563 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/173, G06F15/177, G01R25/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H02J13/00002 (EP,US);
G01R21/133 (US);
G01R19/2513 (EP);
H02J3/00 (EP);
H02J2203/10 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOPOLOGIEERFASSUNG | [2022/06] | English: | TOPOLOGY DETECTION | [2022/06] | French: | DÉTECTION DE TOPOLOGIE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 08.11.2023 | |
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 08.11.2023 | |
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DEKA DEEPJYOTI ET AL, "Structure Learning in Power Distribution Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONTROL OF NETWORK SYSTEMS, IEEE, USA, (20180901), vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TCNS.2017.2673546, pages 1061 - 1074, XP011690421 [A] 1-15 * Part IV A; Algorithm 1; Part V A; Algorithm 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCNS.2017.2673546 | International search | [A]US2003177216 (SUTHERLAND DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2013024149 (NAYAR NITIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2013091258 (SHAFFER SHMUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN103150425 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014032144 (KUSSYK JAROSLAW [AT]) [A] 1-20 * entire document * |