EP3913516 - FILE ACCESS AUTHORITY AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Xiwen Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WEI, Qiang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
TIAN, Wenyuan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Anyu Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
LI, Zhe Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
FANG, Xiwen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
WEI, Qiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
TIAN, Wenyuan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
WANG, Anyu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
05 /
LI, Zhe Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20778010.7 | 13.03.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020CN79104 | Priority number, date | CN201910220920 | 22.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910220920 | [2021/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020192447 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913516 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3913516 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G06F21/6209 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (US);
G06F21/602 (CN,US);
G06F21/6218 (CN,US);
G06F21/6281 (EP,US);
G06F21/64 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DATEIZUGRIFFSBERECHTIGUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/47] | English: | FILE ACCESS AUTHORITY AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'AUTORITÉ POUR UN ACCÈS À DES FICHIERS ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2021 | Translation filed | 18.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9819237 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [XI]WO2018203913 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US]) | International search | [A]US2013062401 (SHEEHAN JOHN M [US], et al); | [Y]CN104281814 (ZHONG DANDONG); | [Y]CN104869569 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO); | [Y]CN108985095 (SHENZHEN ONETHING TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN110059499 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |