EP3946292 - ANDROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS AND METHODS FOR USE AS PROTEOLYSIS TARGETING CHIMERA LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essa Pharma, Inc. 999 West Broadway, Suite 720 Vancouver BC V5Z 1K5 / CA | For all designated states The University of British Columbia University Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Raymond John 4048 West 32nd Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1Z6 / CA | 02 /
ZHOU, Han-Jie 830 Argus Court Foster City, California 94404 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Raymond John Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1Z6 / CA | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Han-Jie Foster City, California 94404 / US | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20778151.9 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US25542 | Priority number, date | US201962825387P | 28.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962825387 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020198711 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946292 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/09, A61K31/10, A61K31/255, A61K51/04 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61K47/545 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D417/14 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/55 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/54 (US);
A61P35/00 (KR);
C07D207/08 (KR);
C07D231/38 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D233/64 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D233/88 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D237/20 (EP,IL);
C07D239/42 (US);
C07D239/47 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D239/48 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D241/20 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D261/08 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D261/10 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D261/12 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D261/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D263/32 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D263/46 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D263/48 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D271/113 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D277/52 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D307/66 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D401/04 (KR);
C07D401/06 (KR);
C07D401/12 (KR);
C07D401/14 (KR);
C07D403/04 (KR);
C07D403/06 (KR);
C07D413/12 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D417/04 (KR);
C07D417/12 (KR);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D471/14 (EP,IL);
C07D487/10 (KR);
C07D491/052 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | ANDROGENREZEPTOR-MODULATOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS GEGEN PROTEOLYSE GERICHTETE CHIMÄRE LIGANDEN | [2022/06] | English: | ANDROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS AND METHODS FOR USE AS PROTEOLYSIS TARGETING CHIMERA LIGANDS | [2022/06] | French: | MODULATEURS DU RÉCEPTEUR DES ANDROGÈNES ET MÉTHODES ASSOCIÉES À UTILISER EN TANT QUE LIGANDS CHIMÈRES CIBLANT LA PROTÉOLYSE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 16.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]WO2016112455 (BRITISH COLUMBIA CANCER AGENCY [CA], et al) [YD] 1-17,19-21 * Table 1 on pages 31-70 * * claims 15, 17, 22-26 *[A] 18; | [YA]US2018228907 (CREW ANDREW P [US], et al) [Y] 1-17,19-21 * claims 2, 4-16, 19, 25, 28-30 * * paragraphs [0376] - [0520] * [A] 18; | [YDA] - NEKLESA TAAVI K ET AL, "ARV-330: Androgen receptor PROTAC degrader for prostate cancer. | Journal of Clinical Oncology", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, vol. 34, no. 2_suppl, doi:10.1200/jco.2016.34.2_suppl.267, (20160110), page 267, URL: https://ascopubs.org/doi/10.1200/jco.2016.34.2_suppl.267, XP093036168 [YD] 1-17,19-21 * the whole document * [A] 18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/jco.2016.34.2_suppl.267 | [YA] - SHANSHAN GU ET AL, "PROTACs: An Emerging Targeting Technique for Protein Degradation in Drug Discovery", BIOESSAYS, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, (20180223), vol. 40, no. 4, doi:10.1002/BIES.201700247, ISSN 0265-9247, page n/a, XP071526852 [Y] 1-17,19-21 * section 5.2 * * figure 5A * [A] 18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bies.201700247 | International search | [A]US2015210681 (BOURQUE ELYSE [US], et al) [A] 1-2, 7, 11 * , entire document, especially: (para [1111], 1-(4'-(3-methoxypropoxy)-[1,1'-biphenyl]-4-yl)cyclopropanecarboxylic acid). *; | [A]WO2016141458 (BRITISH COLUMBIA CANCER AGENCY BRANCH [CA], et al) [A] 1-2, 7, 11 * , entire document, especially: abstract; pg 45, Example 1, Formula III. *; | [A] - RAINA et al., "PROTAC-induced BET protein degradation as a therapy for castration-resistant prostate cancer", PNAS, (20160000), vol. 113, no. 26, doi:10.1073/pnas.1521738113, pages 7124 - 7129, XP055422055 [A] 1-2, 7, 11 * , entire document, especially: pg 7124, col 1, para 2; pg 7124, col 2, para 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1521738113 | [A] - QIN et al., "Discovery of QCA570 as an Exceptionally Potent and Efficacious Proteolysis Targeting Chimera (PROTAC) Degrader of the Bromodomain and Extra-Terminal (BET) Proteins Capable of Inducing Complete and Durable Tumor Regression", J Med Chem., (20180000), vol. 61, no. 15, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.8b00506, pages 6685 - 6704, XP055522768 [A] 1-2, 7, 11 * , entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.8b00506 |