EP3950305 - SEPARATOR FOR POWER STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000006 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Masaki c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 02 /
TAGAWA, Tomoya c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Masaki Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | ||
02 /
TAGAWA, Tomoya Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20778207.9 | 17.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP11849 | Priority number, date | JP20190060924 | 27.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019060924 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020196120 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950305 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01G11/52, H01G9/02, H01M50/409, H01M50/489, B32B5/32, B32B27/32, C08J9/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H01G9/02 (EP,KR);
C08J9/00 (KR);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR);
C08J5/18 (EP);
H01G11/52 (EP,KR);
H01M50/409 (KR,US);
H01M50/449 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/491 (US);
B32B2250/242 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2274/00 (EP);
B32B2307/30 (EP);
B32B2307/5825 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2307/724 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2323/04 (KR);
B32B2323/10 (KR);
B32B2457/10 (EP);
C08J2323/06 (KR);
C08J2323/12 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | B32B5/32, B32B27/32, C08J9/00, H01G11/52, H01M2/16, H01G9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | SEPARATOR FÜR ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | SEPARATOR FOR POWER STORAGE DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | SÉPARATEUR POUR DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2021 | Translation filed | 21.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 10.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH07307146 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [Y] 11,12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0052]; claims 1-4 * [A] 1-10,13; | [A]EP1398344 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0188]; claims 1-4 ** paragraph [0295] - paragraph [0297]; example 1 *; | [A]EP1726602 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0085]; tables 1,2,3 *; | [YA]EP2374840 (PRIME POLYMER CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 11,12 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0098] * [A] 1-10,13; | [XY]JP2011256258 (ASAHI KASEI E-MATERIALS CORP, et al) [X] 1-10,13 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0067]; examples 1,2; claims 1-3 * [Y] 11,12; | [A]US2016079580 (SAWADA TAKAHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0150]; table 1 *; | [YA]JP2018200796 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [Y] 11,12 * column 41 - column 126 * [A] 1-10,13; | [A]JP2019023253 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0084] * | International search | [A]JP2006016550 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0043], [0060] *; | [A]WO2007015416 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0113], example 1 *; | [XY]JP2011256258 (ASAHI KASEI E-MATERIALS CORP, et al) [X] 1-10, 13 * paragraphs [0051], [0053]-[0054], [0060]-[0063], example 1 * [Y] 11-12; | [A]JP2012117078 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0002], [0025]-[0027], table 6, comparative example 206 *; | [A]JP2014181250 (JAPAN POLYETHYLENE CORP) [A] 1-13 * example 1, comparative examples 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2017047576 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) [Y] 11-12 * paragraphs [0077], [0106] *; | [Y]JP2018200796 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [Y] 11-12 * paragraphs [0088], [0170] * | by applicant | JP2012092286 | JP2013517152 | JP2016022676 | JP2018030992 |