EP3928459 - TRANSMISSION PRE-EMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JRD Communication (Shenzhen) Ltd 8/F Block F4 TCL Tower TCL International E City 1001 Zhongshan Yuan Road Xili Street, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCO, Olivier Portes de la Defense 15-55 Boulevard Charles de Gaulle 92700 Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
MARCO, Olivier 92700 Colombes / FR | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20779472.8 | 27.03.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020IB52928 | Priority number, date | US201962825421P | 28.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962825421 P | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020194258 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928459 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L1/18, H04L47/24, H04W72/14 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1887 (US);
H04L47/245 (EP);
H04W72/569 (US);
H04L1/1835 (EP);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORBELEGUNG | [2021/52] | English: | TRANSMISSION PRE-EMPTION | [2021/52] | French: | PRÉEMPTION DE TRANSMISSION | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 18.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/09] | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2020170043 (LENOVO SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG]); | International search | [A]WO2012110368 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | [A]WO2016163065 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | [A]CN107431591 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC); | [A]US2018219604 (LU QIANXI [CN], et al); | [X]WO2019032748 (SHARP LABORATORIES AMERICA INC [US]); | by applicant | WO2020170043 |