Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3946252 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2020245575 CA3134965 CN202080039522 EP20779893 JP2021557624 KR20217033338 US201916368123 US2020025093W



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102736929BGlobal Dossier 03.12.2024B1
KR20210129735 28.10.2021A
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019
WO2020US25093 27.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7339357BGlobal Dossier 05.09.2023B2
JP2022527094 30.05.2022A
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019
WO2020US25093 27.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN113939270Global Dossier 14.01.2022A
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019
WO2020US25093 27.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3134965Global Dossier 01.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019
WO2020US25093 27.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2020245575BGlobal Dossier 16.11.2023B2
AU2020245575 11.11.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019
WO2020US25093 27.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3946252Global Dossier 20.07.2022A4
EP3946252 09.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019
WO2020US25093 27.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112021019306 14.12.2021A2
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019
WO2020US25093 27.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020198548Global Dossier 01.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2020306155Global Dossier 01.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201916368123 28.03.2019