EP3923236 - IMAGE-PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE-PROCESSING METHOD, AND IMAGE-PROCESSING COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUKI Naoko c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
IMAI Norihiro c/o NEC Aerospace Systems, Ltd., 5-22-5, Sumiyoshi-cho Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8502 / JP | 03 /
HAGIWARA Kenzaburo c/o NEC Aerospace Systems, Ltd., 5-22-5, Sumiyoshi-cho Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8502 / JP | 04 /
OURA Yoshitaka c/o NEC Aerospace Systems, Ltd., 5-22-5, Sumiyoshi-cho Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8502 / JP | 05 /
MIYAWAKI Masanori c/o NEC Aerospace Systems, Ltd., 5-22-5, Sumiyoshi-cho Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8502 / JP | 06 /
HIROSE Taichi c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 07 /
IKEHARA Takashi c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
KUKI Naoko Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
IMAI Norihiro Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
HAGIWARA Kenzaburo Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8502 / JP | |||
04 /
OURA Yoshitaka Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8502 / JP | |||
05 /
MIYAWAKI Masanori Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-8502 / JP | |||
06 /
HIROSE Taichi Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | |||
07 /
IKEHARA Takashi Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20779958.6 | 19.03.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020JP12422 | Priority number, date | JP20190063369 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019063369 | [2021/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020196308 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923236 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T1/00, G01S13/90 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G01S13/9021 (EP,US);
G06T7/536 (US);
G06T2207/10044 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2021/50] | English: | IMAGE-PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE-PROCESSING METHOD, AND IMAGE-PROCESSING COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2021/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | Translation filed | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 16.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06148321 (NEC CORP); | [Y]WO2018056129 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2018174312 (PHILLIPS DANIEL T [US]); | [A]CN109166084 (UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH); | US2021302567 [ ] (TORIYA HISATOSHI [JP]); | International search | [A]JPS5636085B ; | [A]JP2004220516 (PASCO CORP); | [A]JP2004341422 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2013171335 (HITACHI SOLUTIONS LTD); | [A]JP2015114147 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]WO2018056129 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US10222178 (HUNTER JR ROBERT O [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2015114147 | JP2019063369 |