EP3951051 - WATER-DISPERSIBLE PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paper Papylia Co., Ltd. 506 Harada Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-0852 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHIMOTO, Masaki c/o NIPPON PAPER PAPYLIA CO., LTD., 4-6 Kanda Surugadai, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | 02 /
ISHINO, Yoshiaki c/o NIPPON PAPER PAPYLIA CO., LTD., 4-6 Kanda Surugadai, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
KISHIMOTO, Masaki Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHINO, Yoshiaki Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20779961.0 | 23.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP12730 | Priority number, date | JP20190062722 | 28.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019062722 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020196408 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951051 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3951051 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D21H15/02, B32B29/06, D21H27/00, G09F3/10, D21H27/38 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
D21H17/28 (EP);
D21H27/38 (EP,US);
B32B29/005 (EP,US);
B32B29/06 (EP,US);
B32B7/022 (EP);
C09J7/29 (US);
D21H17/26 (EP);
D21H17/27 (EP);
D21H19/12 (US);
D21H21/22 (EP);
D21H27/10 (EP);
G09F3/02 (US);
G09F3/10 (US);
B32B2255/08 (EP);
B32B2260/028 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2307/7166 (EP);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/72 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/75 (EP);
B32B2405/00 (US);
B32B2519/00 (EP);
B32B2554/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | D21H15/02, B32B29/06, D21H27/00, G09F3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERDISPERGIERBARES PAPIER | [2022/06] | English: | WATER-DISPERSIBLE PAPER | [2022/06] | French: | PAPIER DISPERSABLE DANS L'EAU | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2021 | Translation filed | 10.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5418057 (TOKIYOSHI TOMOFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-2 *; | [A]US2017233909 (WRIGHT ALAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]US2017282520 (CABELL DAVID WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-7* claims 1-20 * | International search | [Y]JPH0949198 (MISHIMA PAPER CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1, 2, 5-7; | [A]JP2006299498 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]JP2007237634 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-7; | [Y]WO2019049619 (NIPPON PAPER PAPYLIA CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1, 2, 5-7; | [A] - MORIYA Masao, "Characteristics of Papers and the morphological properties of woods", Japan Tappi Journal, (19670321), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 19 - 28, XP055744577 [A] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2524/jtappij.21.141 | by applicant | JPS6010461B |