EP3797750 - REHABILITATION SUPPORT DEVICE AND REHABILITATION SUPPORT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medivr, Inc. 106 Royal Queens Park Ryokuchikoen 3-8 Terauchi 2-chome Toyonaka City, Osaka 561-0872 / JP | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA, Masahiko c/o mediVR Inc. 106 Royal Queens Park Ryokuchikoen 3-8 Terauchi 2-chome Toyonaka City Osaka 5610872 / JP | [2021/14] |
Former [2021/13] | 01 /
HARA Masahiko c/o mediVR Inc. 106 Royal Queens Park Ryokuchikoen 3-8 Terauchi 2-chome Toyonaka City Osaka 5610872 / JP | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 20780551.6 | 20.05.2020 | [2021/13] | WO2020JP19919 | Priority number, date | JP20190141766 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019141766 | [2021/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021019874 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797750 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02, G06F3/01, A63B22/00, A63B24/00, // A63B71/06 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
A63B22/00 (EP);
A63B24/0003 (US);
A63B24/0075 (EP);
A63B24/0087 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (US);
G06F3/016 (US);
G09B5/06 (EP);
A61H1/02 (EP);
A61H2201/1604 (EP);
A61H2201/165 (EP);
A61H2201/5043 (EP);
A61H2201/5048 (EP);
A61H2201/5084 (EP);
A61H2230/62 (EP);
A63B2022/0094 (EP);
A63B2024/0068 (EP);
A63B2024/0096 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0644 (EP);
A63B2220/803 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | A61H1/02, G09B5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | REHABILITATIONSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND REHABILITATIONSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/13] | English: | REHABILITATION SUPPORT DEVICE AND REHABILITATION SUPPORT METHOD | [2021/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF FACILITANT LA RÉÉDUCATION ET PROCÉDÉ FACILITANT LA RÉÉDUCATION | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2020 | Translation filed | 06.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 06.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005074371 (REABILITY INC, et al) [X] 1-11 * page 48, line 11 - line 16; figures 1-9; claim - *; | [X]EP3153146 (NIHON KOHDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-5; claim - *; | [X]KR20170135459 (UNIST(ULSAN NAT INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY) [KR]) [X] 1-11* figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO2018199196 (MEDIVR INC [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0120]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2018336973 (TADI TEJ [CH], et al) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0082] , [0083]; figures 1-33; claims 1-27 * | International search | [A]JPH0231338B (MEDIVR KK) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0023]-[0060], fig. 1-6 *; | [A]JPH06167925 (PURAISU SUTAAN SLOAN PABURISHI) [A] 1-11* , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]US5407357 (CUTLER BURTON [US]) [A] 1-11 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2003305094 (WARASHINA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0003]-[0007], [0014]-[0020], [0036]-[0043], fig. 1, 2 *; | [A]JP2015066292 (NAMCO BANDAI GAMES INC) [A] 1-11 * , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2019141766 | - "Cerebellar ataxia: pathophysiology and rehabilitation", Clinical Rehabilitation, (20110000), vol. 25, pages 195 - 216 |