EP4028274 - COOLING MODULE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A TANGENTIAL TURBOMACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZZOUZ, Kamel C/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand, CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | 02 /
GARNIER, Sébastien C/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand, CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis CedexCEDEX / FR | 03 /
MAMMERI, Amrid C/o Valeo Systèmes Thermiques ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand, CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20780771.0 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020FR51547 | Priority number, date | FR20190009957 | 10.09.2019 Original published format: FR 1909957 | [2022/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021048495 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028274 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/08, B60K11/04, F01P11/10, F01P5/06 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
B60K11/08 (EP,US);
B60K11/04 (EP,US);
F01P11/10 (EP,US);
F01P5/06 (EP,US);
F04D17/04 (EP);
F01P7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | KÜHLMODUL FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT TANGENTIALER TURBOMASCHINE | [2022/29] | English: | COOLING MODULE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING A TANGENTIAL TURBOMACHINE | [2022/29] | French: | MODULE DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE À TURBOMACHINE TANGENTIELLE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 28.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1488257 (COVRAD LTD) [X] 1,2,10 * figures 1-3 *; | [XA]GB2117721 (FORD MOTOR CO) [X] 1,2,4,10 * figures 1-3 * [A] 5-9; | [X]EP0233174 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [X] 1,2,10 * figures 5,8 *; | [XA]DE3814086 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [X] 1,10 * figures 4-7 * [A] 5-9; | [XY]US2005029027 (KUNIKATA YUHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,10 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3; | [Y]DE102013103551 (HBPO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3* figures 1a, 1b * |