EP4073542 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING TEST DATA FOR TESTING A DISTANCE DETERMINATION IN AN OPTICAL TIME-OF-FLIGHT MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MicroVision, Inc. 18390 NE 68th St Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2023/22] |
Former [2022/42] | For all designated states Ibeo Automotive Systems GmbH Merkurring 60-62 22143 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEUSCHEL, Ralf c/o ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Straße 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20780992.2 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020EP76839 | Priority number, date | DE201910219330 | 11.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019219330 | [2022/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021115652 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4073542 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/497, G01S17/931, G01S7/4865 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
G01S7/497 (EP,KR,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/4865 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON TESTDATEN ZUM TESTEN EINER DISTANZBESTIMMUNG BEI EINER OPTISCHEN LAUFZEITMESSUNG | [2022/42] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING TEST DATA FOR TESTING A DISTANCE DETERMINATION IN AN OPTICAL TIME-OF-FLIGHT MEASUREMENT | [2022/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES DE TEST POUR TESTER UNE DÉTERMINATION DE DISTANCE DANS UNE MESURE OPTIQUE DE TEMPS DE VOL | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 10.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010058194 (MBDA UK LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * pages 12-14 - page 1 *; | [XI]US2015041625 (DUTTON NEALE [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0079] - [0084] * [I] 3-14; | [XI]EP3355133 (AMS AG [AT]) [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] * [I] 3-14; | [A]US2019056497 (PACALA ANGUS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE102018201220 (OSRAM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI] - LI CONGBING ET AL, "Timing measurement BOST architecture with full digital circuit and self-calibration using characteristics variation positively for fine time resolution", 2016 IEEE 21ST INTERNATIONAL MIXED-SIGNAL TESTING WORKSHOP (IMSTW), IEEE, (20160704), doi:10.1109/IMS3TW.2016.7524228, pages 1 - 6, XP032936292 [X] 1,2,15 * Chapter III * [I] 3-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMS3TW.2016.7524228 | by applicant | WO2017081294 |