EP4217810 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MOBILE INDUSTRIAL ROBOT USING A PROBABILISTIC OCCUPANCY GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB SCHWEIZ AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONTAXAKIS, Polychronis 723 58 Västerås / SE | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 20781354.4 | 25.09.2020 | [2023/31] | WO2020EP76970 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063412 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4217810 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G05D1/0274 (EP);
G05D1/0214 (US);
B25J5/00 (US);
G01C21/206 (EP);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0248 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES MOBILEN INDUSTRIEROBOTERS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES PROBABILISTISCHEN BELEGUNGSRASTERS | [2023/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MOBILE INDUSTRIAL ROBOT USING A PROBABILISTIC OCCUPANCY GRID | [2023/31] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN ROBOT INDUSTRIEL MOBILE À L'AIDE D'UNE GRILLE D'OCCUPATION PROBABILISTE | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 13.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016086050 (PIEKNIEWSKI FILIP [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0200] *; | [Y]US2019080463 (DAVISON ANDREW [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0085] *; | [A] - MUNOZ-SALINAS ET AL, "A Bayesian plan-view map based approach for multiple-person detection and tracking", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, vol. 41, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.PATCOG.2008.06.013, ISSN 0031-3203, (20081201), pages 3665 - 3676, (20080620), XP023977330 [A] 1-10 * page 3667 - page 3675 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2008.06.013 | [A] - KONDAXAKIS POLYCHRONIS ET AL, "Robot-Robot Gesturing for Anchoring Representations", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ROBOTICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 35, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TRO.2018.2875388, ISSN 1552-3098, (20190201), pages 216 - 230, (20190204), XP011708894 [A] 1-10 * page 218 - page 227 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRO.2018.2875388 | [A] - LIU ZIYUAN ET AL, "A coherent semantic mapping system based on parametric environment abstraction and 3D object localization", 2013 EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON MOBILE ROBOTS, IEEE, (20130925), doi:10.1109/ECMR.2013.6698848, pages 234 - 239, XP032548169 [A] 1-10 * page 235 - page 238 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECMR.2013.6698848 | by applicant | - CHR. ROBBIANO et al., Bayesian Learning of Occupancy Grids |