EP4042124 - DETECTION OF LEAKS IN HEAT EXCHANGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accutest International Ltd The Forge Enterprise Centre 3 Church Road West Huntspill Highbridge TA9 3RN / GB | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERNER, Thomas Mountfield Cottage Hollow Lane Wembdon Somerset TA6 7PY / GB | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Manaton, Ross Timothy Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20781600.0 | 07.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP78163 | Priority number, date | GB20190014481 | 07.10.2019 Original published format: GB 201914481 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069519 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042124 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/22, F28F7/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G01M3/228 (EP);
G01M3/22 (GB);
F28F27/00 (EP,US);
F28F7/00 (GB);
G01M3/226 (US);
F28F2200/00 (EP,US);
F28F2265/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | DETEKTION VON LECKAGEN IN WÄRMETAUSCHERN | [2022/33] | English: | DETECTION OF LEAKS IN HEAT EXCHANGERS | [2022/33] | French: | DÉTECTION DE FUITES DANS DES ÉCHANGEURS THERMIQUES | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 28.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 22.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2314421 (WERNER THOMAS [GB]) [AD] 1-11* page 2, line 5 - line 22; figure 1 *; | [XI]CN205826237U (GUANGZHOU KNOW-HOW INDUSTRY&EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 1-3,7,9-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0014]; figure 1; claim 3 * [I] 4-6,8 | by applicant | US3425264 | GB2314421 | EP1236028 | EP1608942 |