|
05.11.2024 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.02.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.02.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.02.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.08.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2022 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2022 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2022 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2022 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2022 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.01.2021 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
12.01.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.01.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.01.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
10.12.2020 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Reply to invitation to furnish sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
55 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Invitation to furnish nucleotide and/or Amino Acid Sequence Listing |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Invitation to furnish nucleotide and/or amino acid sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
43 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |