EP3950375 - LAMINATED BODY MANUFACTURING METHOD, PAINTING OBJECT MANUFACTURING METHOD, JOINING STRUCTURE MANUFACTURING METHOD, THERMAL TRANSFER SHEET, AND LAMINATED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOKAWA Kayo c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
MAKIHATA Yosuke c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
ENDO Asuka c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
NAKAO Eriko c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 05 /
OKADA Kenichi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 06 /
OBAN Ryohei c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 07 /
ISHIGURO Shigeki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
SHIMOKAWA Kayo Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | ||
02 /
MAKIHATA Yosuke Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
03 /
ENDO Asuka Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKAO Eriko Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
05 /
OKADA Kenichi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
06 /
OBAN Ryohei Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
07 /
ISHIGURO Shigeki Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20782679.3 | 12.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP10939 | Priority number, date | JP20190068826 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019068826 | JP20190193739 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019193739 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203160 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950375 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/17, C09D5/00, C09D201/00, B32B37/26 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B44C1/172 (EP,US);
B32B37/025 (KR,US);
B32B37/26 (KR,US);
B44C1/17 (KR);
B32B2037/268 (US);
B32B2305/076 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LAMINIERTEN KÖRPERS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LACKIEROBJEKTS, VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTURHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, THERMOTRANSFERFOLIE UND LAMINIERTER KÖRPER | [2022/06] | English: | LAMINATED BODY MANUFACTURING METHOD, PAINTING OBJECT MANUFACTURING METHOD, JOINING STRUCTURE MANUFACTURING METHOD, THERMAL TRANSFER SHEET, AND LAMINATED BODY | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CORPS STRATIFIÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'OBJET À PEINDRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE STRUCTURE D'ASSEMBLAGE, FEUILLE DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE ET CORPS STRATIFIÉ | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2021 | Translation filed | 30.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 14.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/50] | 20.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019030829 (OKADA KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *[I] 14 | International search | [XY]JP2010230700 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1-10, 12-13 * examples 1-2 * [Y] 11, 14; | [A]JP2014012398 (NIPPON SODA CO) [A] 1-14; | [A]JP2014175116 (DAICEL CORP, et al)[A] 1-14; | [XY]JP2015189043 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 7-10, 12- 13 * example 1, paragraphs [0021], [0024], [0047] * [Y] 6, 11, 14; | [XYA]WO2018061741 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4, 7-13 * examples 1-11 * [Y] 14 [A] 5-6; | [A]JP2019006086 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-14 | by applicant | FR101F | FR104E | FR105F | JP2000226536 | JP2012197427 | JP2017128722 | JP2019068826 | JP2019193739 |