EP3950175 - BONDING MATERIAL AND BONDED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANAI, Kei c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd., 1333-2, Haraichi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 02 /
JO, Jung-Lae c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd., 1333-2, Haraichi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
ANAI, Kei Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | ||
02 /
JO, Jung-Lae Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20783002.7 | 02.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP08654 | Priority number, date | JP20190068289 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019068289 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020202971 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950175 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F7/08, B22F7/00, B22F7/06 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B22F7/08 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/052 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/054 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/0551 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/056 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/068 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/107 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/147 (EP,KR,US);
B22F7/008 (EP);
B22F7/064 (EP);
B23K35/0238 (US);
B23K35/302 (US);
B32B15/01 (US);
C22C1/0425 (KR);
H01L23/14 (KR);
H01L24/29 (US);
H01L24/45 (US);
H01R4/02 (KR);
B22F2007/042 (KR);
B22F2301/10 (US);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
H01L2224/29124 (US);
H01L2224/29139 (US);
H01L2224/29144 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSMATERIAL UND VERBUNDENE STRUKTUR | [2022/06] | English: | BONDING MATERIAL AND BONDED STRUCTURE | [2022/06] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE LIAISON, ET STRUCTURE DE LIAISON | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2021 | Translation filed | 08.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 13.09.2023 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 03.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2015076232 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [X]JP2015090900 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [XI]US2018269074 (KAMIKORIYAMA YOICHI [JP], et al); | [E]EP3834965 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) | International search | [X]JP2013209720 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JP2015090900 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]WO2015068853 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2017221613 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]); | [X]JP2018501657 | by applicant | US2014225247 |