EP3951779 - METHOD FOR ENHANCING FAR-FIELD SPEECH RECOGNITION RATE, SYSTEM AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen TCL New Technology Co., Ltd 9th Floor, Building D4 TCL International E-City No.1001, Zhongshan Park Road Xili Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wenjie 9th Floor, Building D4, TCL International E City No.1001, Zhongshan Park Road, Xili Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
CHEN, Wenjie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518052 / CN | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20783050.6 | 24.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020CN80826 | Priority number, date | CN201910262894 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910262894 | [2022/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020199971 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951779 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/0208, G01S13/88, G01S7/41, G01S13/42, G01S3/86, H04R3/00, // G10L15/00, G10L21/0216, G10L25/84 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
G10L21/0208 (EP);
H04R1/406 (US);
G01S13/42 (EP);
G01S13/88 (EP,CN);
G01S13/89 (US);
G01S3/86 (EP);
G01S5/06 (CN,US);
G01S7/41 (EP);
G10L15/00 (EP,US);
G10L15/26 (CN);
G10L21/0216 (CN);
G10L25/51 (CN);
H04R3/005 (EP);
G10L2021/02166 (EP,CN);
G10L25/84 (EP);
H04R2430/23 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | G10L25/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FERNFELDSPRACHERKENNUNGSRATE, SYSTEM UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD FOR ENHANCING FAR-FIELD SPEECH RECOGNITION RATE, SYSTEM AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DU TAUX DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE EN CHAMP LOINTAIN, SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2021 | Translation filed | 10.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 29.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]CN107346661 (LI XIN) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]CN107491101 (GOERTEK TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2018199136 (SCULLEY DARRIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [X]CN108594987 (INST AUTOMATION CAS) [X] 1-15 * description paragraphs [0042]-[0097], figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN108877827 (FUZHOU ROCKCHIP ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [PX]CN110085258 (SHENZHEN TCL NEW TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-15 * claims 1-11, description paragraphs [0022]-[0032] * |