EP3950210 - CRACK REPAIRING METHOD FOR EXISTING STEEL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKITA, Daiki c/o IHI CORPORATION, 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Naoyuki c/o IHI CORPORATION, 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 03 /
INOSE, Koutarou c/o IHI CORPORATION, 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
OKITA, Daiki Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMOTO, Naoyuki Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | |||
03 /
INOSE, Koutarou Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | O'Connor, Dominic David Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20783146.2 | 23.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP12712 | Priority number, date | JP20190068100 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019068100 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203411 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950210 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/342, B23K26/21, B23K26/348, B23K9/04, B23K9/23, B23K26/00, B23K26/34, B23P6/04, E01D22/00, E01D101/30, E04G23/02, B23K103/04 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B23K26/0006 (EP);
B23K26/342 (US);
B23K26/34 (EP);
B23K9/04 (EP);
B23K9/23 (EP);
B23P6/04 (EP);
E01D22/00 (EP,US);
E04G23/0203 (EP,US);
B23K2103/04 (EP);
E01D2101/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | B23K26/342, B23K26/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REPARIEREN VON RISSEN FÜR BESTEHENDE STAHLSTRUKTUREN | [2022/06] | English: | CRACK REPAIRING METHOD FOR EXISTING STEEL STRUCTURE | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION DE FISSURES POUR STRUCTURE EN ACIER EXISTANTE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2011 | Translation filed | 03.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003311463 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 36]; figures 1, 3, 4; claims 1-9 *; | [A]JP4057833B (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,2* claims 1-3 *; | [A]JP2013086163 (IHI CORP, et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0035] - [0039]; figure 11 (B); claims 1-14 *; | [A]JP2015024440 (IHI CORP, et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0013]; claims 1, 5 * | International search | [A]JPS6191371 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-2 * , gazette, page 3, upper right column, line 17 to page 7, upper right column, line 4, fig. 1-5 *; | [A]JPH0191993 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO, et al) [A] 1-2 * , gazette, page 3, lower left column, line 20 to page 4, upper right column, line 18, fig. 1-12 *; | [A]US2002148817 (TEWARI SUDHIR KUMAR [US]) [A] 1-2* , paragraphs [0008]-[0021], fig. 1, 2 *; | [A]JP6384632B (CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC.) [A] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0022]-[0051], fig. 1A-5 * | by applicant | JP5860264B |