EP3947363 - SPHINGOSINE 1 PHOSPHATE RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RECEPTOS LLC 430 East 29th Street, 14 Floor New York, NY 10016 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNBULL, Philip 86 Morris Avenue Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 02 /
BAKALE, Roger 86 Morris Avenue Summit, Washington 07901 / US | 03 /
SCHKERYANTZ, Jeff 86 Morris Avenue Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 04 /
MARSINI, Maurice 86 Morris Avenue Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
TURNBULL, Philip Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | ||
02 /
BAKALE, Roger Summit, Washington 07901 / US | |||
03 /
SCHKERYANTZ, Jeff Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | |||
04 /
MARSINI, Maurice Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20783224.7 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US25132 | Priority number, date | US201962826769P | 29.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962826769 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020205478 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947363 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D271/06, C07D413/12 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
C07D271/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4245 (KR);
A61K31/454 (KR);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61K31/5377 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D403/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | SPHINGOSIN-1-PHOSPHAT-REZEPTORMODULATOREN | [2022/06] | English: | SPHINGOSINE 1 PHOSPHATE RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2022/06] | French: | MODULATEURS DU RÉCEPTEUR DE LA SPHINGOSINE-1-PHOSPHATE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 04.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/50] | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US9388147 (MARTINBOROUGH ESTHER [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2017320839 (MARTINBOROUGH ESTHER [US], et al) [A] 1-8* , entire document. *; | [A]US2018016244 (ZHANG CHENGZHI [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire document. *; | [X]WO2018208855 (CELGENE INT II SARL [CH]) [X] 1-8 * , entire document, especially: pg 8, In 6-17; pg 9, Table 1. *; | [A]US2018369212 (RABBANI ELAZAR [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire document. * |