EP3949438 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SPATIAL AUDIO RENDERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syng, Inc. 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRINGER, Christopher, John 31 28th Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 02 /
FAMILY, Afrooz 8206 McConnell Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | 03 /
RENN-GILES, Fabian 14 Otter Way West Drayton UB7 8FA / GB | 04 /
NARAJOWSKI, David 600 S. Morrison Avenue San Jose, CA 95126 / US | 05 /
SONG, Joshua Phillip 4571 Inglewood Blvd., Apt 2 Los Angeles, CA 90230 / US | 06 /
SARCIA, Sam Rhea 8950 Bower Lane Lakeside, CA 92040 / US | 07 /
MORELAND, John 22533 S Vermont Avenu, unit 8 Torrance, CA 90502 / US | 08 /
PATEL, Pooja 4150 Horizon Court San Jose, CA 95148 / US | 09 /
ARROCHA, Pere, Aizcorbe 1114 16th Street, Apt 5 Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | 10 /
BROWN, Matthew Studio 206, New Lab, Building 128 19 Morris Avenue Brooklyn, NY 11205 / US | 11 /
ORDING, Bas 619 29th Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 12 /
TILTON, Robert 1341 N. Fuller Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90046 / US | 13 /
COGGIN, Jay, Sterling 137 Mcguinness Blvd., Apt. 2 Brooklyn, NY 11222 / US | 14 /
VETTER, Lasse 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 15 /
FAN, Yuan-Yi 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 16 /
KENNEDY, Zachery 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 17 /
O'BRIEN, Sean Patrick 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 18 /
SUDA, Nick 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 19 /
MANGIAT, Stephen 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 20 /
MCGEE, Ryan 210 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 21 /
BEN-HAIM, Yoav 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 22 /
SESTO, Adrian 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 23 /
CARINO, Marc 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 24 /
CHASE, Alex 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 25 /
KNUDSON, Nicholas 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 26 /
HOYT, Natan 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 27 /
KYRIAKAKIS, Christos 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 28 /
RAKES, Mark 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 29 /
MIHELICH, Ryan 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 30 /
THOMPSON, Nicholas 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 31 /
ROBBETTS, Matthew 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | 32 /
SADEK, Ramy 120 Mildred Avenue Venice, CA 90291 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
STRINGER, Christopher, John Venice, CA 90291 / US | ||
02 /
FAMILY, Afrooz Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | |||
03 /
RENN-GILES, Fabian West Drayton UB7 8FA / GB | |||
04 /
NARAJOWSKI, David San Jose, CA 95126 / US | |||
05 /
SONG, Joshua Phillip Los Angeles, CA 90230 / US | |||
06 /
SARCIA, Sam Rhea Lakeside, CA 92040 / US | |||
07 /
MORELAND, John Torrance, CA 90502 / US | |||
08 /
PATEL, Pooja San Jose, CA 95148 / US | |||
09 /
ARROCHA, Pere, Aizcorbe Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | |||
10 /
BROWN, Matthew Brooklyn, NY 11205 / US | |||
11 /
ORDING, Bas San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | |||
12 /
TILTON, Robert Los Angeles, CA 90046 / US | |||
13 /
COGGIN, Jay, Sterling Brooklyn, NY 11222 / US | |||
14 /
VETTER, Lasse Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
15 /
FAN, Yuan-Yi Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
16 /
KENNEDY, Zachery Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
17 /
O'BRIEN, Sean Patrick Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
18 /
SUDA, Nick Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
19 /
MANGIAT, Stephen Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
20 /
MCGEE, Ryan Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
21 /
BEN-HAIM, Yoav Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
22 /
SESTO, Adrian Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
23 /
CARINO, Marc Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
24 /
CHASE, Alex Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
25 /
KNUDSON, Nicholas Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
26 /
HOYT, Natan Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
27 /
KYRIAKAKIS, Christos Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
28 /
RAKES, Mark Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
29 /
MIHELICH, Ryan Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
30 /
THOMPSON, Nicholas Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
31 /
ROBBETTS, Matthew Venice, CA 90291 / US | |||
32 /
SADEK, Ramy Venice, CA 90291 / US | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20783235.3 | 02.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US26471 | Priority number, date | US201962828357P | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828357 P | US201962878696P | 25.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962878696 P | US201962935034P | 13.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962935034 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206177 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3949438 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/26, H04R1/20, H04R3/12, H04R1/40, H04R1/30, H04R3/00, H04S7/00, // H04S5/00 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H04S7/30 (EP);
H04R3/12 (EP,KR);
H04S7/305 (KR,US);
H04S5/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04S7/302 (KR,US);
H04R2201/401 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | H04R1/26, H04R1/20, H04R3/12, H04R1/40, H04R1/30, H04R3/00, H04S7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR RÄUMLICHEN AUDIOWIEDERGABE | [2022/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SPATIAL AUDIO RENDERING | [2022/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RENDU AUDIO SPATIAL | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 24.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2022 | 30.04.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2023 | 30.04.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2016021476 (ROBINSON CHARLES Q [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0100] *[A] 4-9; | [XYI]US2017374465 (FAMILY AFROOZ [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0062]; figures 6-9 * [Y] 10 [I] 9 | International search | [Y]US2011069856 (BLORE DAVID EDWARDS [US], et al) [Y] 3-5 * ; figures 1, 3, 8B & 9, paragraphs [0035]-[0036], & [0051] *; | [Y]US2014219455 (PETERS NILS GÜNTHER [US], et al) [Y] 8, 11-12, 30-32, & 34-35 * ; figure 10, paragraphs [0047], [0085]-[0086], [0129], [0132], [0134]-[0135], & [0166] *; | [XY]US2015245157 (SEEFELDT ALAN J [US]) [X] 1, 6-7, 9, 13, & 16 * ; figure 5, paragraphs [0033], [0037]-[0038], [0047]-[0064], [0089], & [0092]-[0093] * [Y] 8 & 10-11; | [Y]US2017125030 (KOPPENS JEROEN GERARDUS HENRICUS [NL], et al) [Y] 10, 15, 30, & 33* ; figure 1, paragraphs [0011], [0086], [0093]-[0094], [0097]-[0099], [0162] *; | [XY]US2017238090 (JOHNSON MARTIN E [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * ; figure 1, paragraphs [0029]-[0040], [0050]-[0051], & [0055] * [Y] 3-5; | [XY]US2017374465 (FAMILY AFROOZ [US], et al) [X] 1, 6, 14, 17-21, & 26-29 * ; figures 1A, 1 B, 2B, 7, paragraphs [0024], [0033], [0037], [0041], [0040]-[0064] * [Y] 12, 15, & 30-35 |