EP3947673 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PROTEOMIC PROFILING AND CHARACTERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mission Bio, Inc. 400 E Jamie Ct, Suite 100 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states Mission Bio, Inc. 6000 Shoreline Court South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHINGRA, Dalia 616 Arlinton St. San Francisco California 94131 / US | 02 /
RUFF, David 2000 Broadway Street 317 San Francisco California 94115 / US | 03 /
MENDEZ, Pedro 137 Laurie Meadows Dr Apt 183 San Mateo California 94403 / US | 04 /
OOI, Aik 509 Highland Ave Apt D San Mateo California 94401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
DHINGRA, Dalia San Francisco California 94131 / US | ||
02 /
RUFF, David San Francisco California 94115 / US | |||
03 /
MENDEZ, Pedro San Mateo California 94403 / US | |||
04 /
OOI, Aik San Mateo California 94401 / US | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20783466.4 | 02.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US26479 | Priority number, date | US201962828416P | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828416 P | US201962828420P | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828420 P | US201962828386P | 02.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828386 P | US201962829358P | 04.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962829358 P | US201962829291P | 04.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962829291 P | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206183 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947673 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6804, C12Q1/6806, C12Q1/6869, G01N33/53 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6804 (EP);
C12Q1/6888 (US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP);
C12Q1/686 (US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2565/1015 (US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP);
C12Q2600/16 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2521/537, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2565/514 (EP);
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2521/101, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/179, C12Q2565/514 (EP);
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179 (EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR PROTEOMISCHEN PROFILIERUNG UND CHARAKTERISIERUNG | [2022/06] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PROTEOMIC PROFILING AND CHARACTERIZATION | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE PROFILAGE ET DE CARACTÉRISATION PROTÉOMIQUES | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 25.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/51] | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2018226293 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0468] , [0470] , [0649] , [0668] , [0681] , [0736] * * paragraph [0540] - paragraph [0542] ** paragraph [0644] - paragraph [0646] * | International search | [A]WO2014207245 (INSERM INST NAT DE LA SANTÉ ET DE LA RECH MÉDICALE [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2017192013 (AGRESTI JEREMY [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018022581 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2018056288 (ABATE ADAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2018088112 (FAN CHRISTINA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2018216160 (ABATE ADAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2018284125 (GORDON DAVID BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1 -20 * entire document *; | [A]US2018304222 (WEITZ DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2019025304 (VIGNEAULT FRANCOIS [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A] - Payam Shahi, Samuel C. Kim, John R. Haliburton, Zev J. Gartner , Adam R. Abate, "Abseq: Ultrahigh-throughput Single Cell Protein Profiling With Droplet Microfluidic Barcoding", Scientific Reports, (20170314), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/srep44447, pages 1 - 12, XP055586462 [A] 1-20 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep44447 | [PA] - Benjamin Demaree, Cyrille Delley, David Ruff, Sebastian Treusch, Dennis Eastburn, Keith Jones, Adam Abate, "Abstract 3527: Combined high-throughput DNA genotyping and protein quantification in single cancer cells", Cancer Research, (20190731), vol. 79, no. 13, doi:10.1158/1538-7445.AM2019-3527, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1 - 1, XP009523809 [PA] 1-20 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2019-3527 |