EP3933954 - CAP ASSEMBLY AND SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/01] | TOP COVER COMPONENT AND SECONDARY CELL | ||
[2023/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No.2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | ||
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SU, Huasheng No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Shoujun No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Xinxiang No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
ZHENG, Yulian No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Peng No. 2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/07] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
SU, Huasheng Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
HUANG, Shoujun Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
03 /
CHEN, Xinxiang Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHENG, Yulian Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
05 /
WANG, Peng Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20783509.1 | 20.03.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020CN80428 | Priority number, date | CN201920426787U | 01.04.2019 Original published format: CN 201920426787 U | [2022/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020199940 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933954 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3933954 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/15, H01M50/176, H01M50/147, H01M50/543 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H01M50/147 (EP,US);
H01M50/528 (US);
H01M50/562 (EP,US);
H01M50/591 (EP,US);
H01M50/176 (EP,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H01M2/04, H01M2/06, H01M2/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEDECKELBAUGRUPPE UND SEKUNDÄRE BATTERIE | [2023/06] | English: | CAP ASSEMBLY AND SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/06] | French: | ENSAMBLE BOUCHON ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2023/06] |
Former [2022/01] | DECKELKOMPONENTE UND SEKUNDÄRZELLE | ||
Former [2022/01] | TOP COVER COMPONENT AND SECONDARY CELL | ||
Former [2022/01] | COMPOSANT DE RECOUVREMENT SUPÉRIEUR ET CELLULE SECONDAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2021 | Translation filed | 29.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 16.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22216782.7 / EP4191758 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2023 | CZ | 15.02.2023 | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | ES | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | PL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | IE | 20.03.2023 | LU | 20.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
IE | 20.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
LU | 20.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN108963122 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN208478389U (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1,15* abstract *; | [IP]EP3582283 (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [IP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2014315056 (GUEN MINHYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-16* entire document *; | [A]CN108767143 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [X]CN108963122 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-16 * description, paragraphs 0044-0071, figures 1-9 *; | [A]CN208622794U (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [PX]CN209496906U (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-16 * description, paragraphs 0065-0085, figures 1-9 * |