Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3949694 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CA3135691 CN202080040403 EP20783689 IB2020053057 JP2021558976 KR20217034937 US202016835966



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11183379Global Dossier 23.11.2021B2
US2020343083 29.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962827483 01.04.2019
US202016835966 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20210143885Global Dossier 29.11.2021A
Priority number Date
US201962827483 01.04.2019
WO2020IB53057 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2022527350Global Dossier 01.06.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962827483 01.04.2019
WO2020IB53057 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN113906828Global Dossier 07.01.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962827483 01.04.2019
WO2020IB53057 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3135691Global Dossier 08.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962827483 01.04.2019
WO2020IB53057 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3949694Global Dossier 30.04.2025B1
EP3949694 28.12.2022A4
EP3949694 09.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962827483 01.04.2019
WO2020IB53057 31.03.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11202110877W 29.11.2021A
Priority number Date
US201962827483 01.04.2019
WO2020IB53057 31.03.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2020202008Global Dossier 08.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201962827483 01.04.2019