EP3939197 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING 5G NEW RADIO UPLINK POSITIONING REFERENCE SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QI, Yinan Samsung Electronics (UK) Limited Samsung R&D Institute UK Communications House, South Street Staines, Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
QI, Yinan Staines, Middlesex TW18 4QE / GB | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20783779.0 | 01.04.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020KR04462 | Priority number, date | GB20190004656 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: GB 201904656 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020204600 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3939197 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B7/06, H04B17/373, H04J11/00, H04W56/00, H04B7/08 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,GB);
H04B17/373 (KR);
H04B7/0408 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0682 (KR);
H04B7/0695 (KR);
H04B7/088 (KR);
H04J11/0069 (KR);
H04L5/0023 (KR);
H04L5/0092 (KR);
H04W56/0035 (KR);
H04W56/0045 (US);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04W72/23 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURIERUNG VON 5G-NEW-RADIO-POSITIONIERUNGSREFERENZSIGNALEN | [2022/03] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING 5G NEW RADIO UPLINK POSITIONING REFERENCE SIGNALS | [2022/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR CONFIGURER DES SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE DE POSITIONNEMENT DE LIAISON MONTANTE 5G NEW RADIO | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 11.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 21.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Design Aspects for NR UL Positioning", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190216), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1902512 INTEL - NR_UL_POS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96/Docs/R1%2D1902512%2Ezip, (20190216), XP051600208 [X] 1,3,5-7,9,11-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 8,10,14 [I] 2,4 | [X] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Summary for NR-Positioning AI - 7.2.10.1.2 UL only based Positioning", vol. RAN WG1, (20190226), pages 1 - 12, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1903395, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96/Docs/R1%2D1903395%2Ezip, XP051601070 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20180130875 (KOREA POLYTECHNIC UNIV INDUSTRY ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR])[A] 1-15; | [A]WO2019032887 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15; | [Y] - Intel Corporation, "Design Aspects for NR UL Positioning", 3GPP Draft; R1-1902512 Intel - NR_UL_POS, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190216), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, XP051600208 [Y] 1-15 | [Y] - Intel Corporation, "Summary for NR-Positioning AI - 7.2.10.1.2 UL only based Positioning", 3GPP Draft; R1-1903395, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190301), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 12, XP051601070 [Y] 1-15 | [A] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "Considerations on UTDOA in NR", 3GPP Draft; R2-1904101 Consideration on UTDOA in NR, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20190329), vol. RAN WG2, no. Xi’an, China; 20190408 - 20190412, XP051693332 [A] 1-15 | by applicant | - "Design Aspects for NR UL Positioning", INTEL CORPORATION, 3GPP Draft; RI - 1902512 Intel - NR UL POS, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP, Mobile Competence Centre, (20190216), vol. RAN WG1 | - "Summary for NR-Positioning Al - 7.2.10.1.2 UL only based Positioning", INTEL CORPORATION, 3GPP Draft; RI-1903395, Mobile Competence Centre, (20190301), pages 1 - 12 |