EP3950310 - OPTICAL LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Na Young LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
RAH, Kyun Il LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
BYUN, Jin Seok LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
HONG, Kyung Ki LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
CHANG, Yeong Rae LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
SHIN, Na Young Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
RAH, Kyun Il Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
BYUN, Jin Seok Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
04 /
HONG, Kyung Ki Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
05 /
CHANG, Yeong Rae Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20784226.1 | 31.01.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020KR01456 | Priority number, date | KR20190037449 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: KR 20190037449 | [2022/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020204329 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950310 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/023, B32B27/30, B32B3/26, B32B27/08, B32B7/12, G02B5/30, B32B5/16, B32B5/30, B32B27/36, B32B27/40 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
B32B3/26 (EP);
B32B7/023 (EP,KR);
G02B5/3033 (US);
B32B27/08 (KR);
B32B27/306 (EP,KR);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B3/266 (KR);
B32B5/16 (EP);
B32B5/30 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR);
C08K3/02 (EP);
C08K3/16 (EP);
C08L29/04 (KR,US);
C08L35/02 (US);
C08L45/00 (US);
G02B1/08 (US);
G02B1/14 (EP);
G02B5/206 (US);
G02B5/208 (US);
G02B5/30 (KR);
G02B5/3083 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/20 (EP);
B32B2260/025 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2307/42 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/514 (EP);
B32B2307/712 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2457/20 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/02, C08L29/04 (EP);
C08K3/16, C08L29/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/06] | B32B7/023, B32B27/30, B32B3/26, B32B27/08, B32B7/12, G02B5/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES LAMINAT | [2022/06] | English: | OPTICAL LAMINATE | [2022/06] | French: | STRATIFIÉ OPTIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2020 | Translation filed | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 11.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3251832 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]EP3413104 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]KR20060051782 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]KR20140006876 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [A]KR20140085292 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20170129669 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2018200463 (NITTO DENKO CORP) | by applicant | KR20190037449 |