EP3947022 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intdevice Limited 138e Harris Road East Tamaki, Auckland 2013 / NZ | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Li Jun 54 Castleton Drive Mellons Bay Auckland, 2014 / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
YU, Li Jun Auckland, 2014 / NZ | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20784364.0 | 02.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020IB53121 | Priority number, date | NZ20110197524 | 05.04.2019 Original published format: NZ 19752411 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020202049 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3947022 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/124, H02J50/10, H02J50/60, H02J7/00, H02J50/40 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B60L53/124 (EP,AU,US);
H02J50/10 (AU,US);
B60L53/38 (US);
H02J50/402 (AU,US);
H02J50/60 (AU,US);
H02J50/90 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR DRAHTLOSEN STROMÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/06] | English: | WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEMS | [2022/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015075858 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0044]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2017097437 (WIDMER HANS PETER [CH], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10,14 * figures 1,8 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0088] *; | [A]US2018191204 (CHA JAE EUN [KR], et al) [A] 1,11,14 * abstract ** paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0156]; figures 7-8 * | International search | [A]US9178361 (LIU XUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract; figure 5; (col 1, line 41- col 2 line 29) *; | [X]US2017040848 (LANNOIJE MARNIX [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract; Figures 1, 2 and 9; [0003], [0014]-[0015], [0026], [0029], [0035]-[0036], [0051], [0069], [0118], [0125] *; | [A]US2018198323 (WIDMER HANS PETER [CH], et al) [A] 1-18* whole document * | by applicant | WO2015075858 |