EP3946906 - METHODS, SYSTEMS AND DEVICES FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT GENERATION AND PHYSICAL MASK CURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calt Dynamics Ltd Unit D3 Network Enterprise Park Kilcoole Co., Wicklow A63P110 / IE | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWLESS, Ross 4 Church Road Newtown Mount Kennedy A63KC85 / IE | 02 /
VILLAFANE, Irene 4 Church Road Newtown Mount Kennedy A63KC85 / IE | 03 /
KATZ, Warren 20 Fairfield Boston, Massachusetts 021164 / US | 04 /
MCDONAGH, Mark 33 Cherrywood Grove Clondalkin Dublin 22 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LAWLESS, Ross Newtown Mount Kennedy A63KC85 / IE | ||
02 /
VILLAFANE, Irene Newtown Mount Kennedy A63KC85 / IE | |||
03 /
KATZ, Warren Boston, Massachusetts 021164 / US | |||
04 /
MCDONAGH, Mark Dublin 22 / IE | Representative(s) | Biallo, Dario, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20784937.3 | 02.04.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020US26288 | Priority number, date | US201962829367P | 04.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962829367 P | WO2019US43764 | 26.07.2019 Original published format: PCT/US2019/043764 | [2022/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020206053 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3946906 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/129, B29C64/286, B29C64/255, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/20 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B33Y40/20 (EP);
B29C64/129 (EP);
B29C64/255 (EP);
B29C64/286 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | B29C67/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DREIDIMENSIONALE OBJEKTGENERIERUNG UND PHYSIKALISCHE MASKENHÄRTUNG | [2022/06] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS AND DEVICES FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT GENERATION AND PHYSICAL MASK CURING | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET DISPOSITIFS POUR LA GÉNÉRATION D'OBJETS EN TROIS DIMENSIONS ET LE DURCISSEMENT DE MASQUE PHYSIQUE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 24.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JPH04301431 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [I] 1-13,15 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * [A] 14; | [A]US2017217052 (WU LI-HAN [TW]) [A] 1-3,11,12* paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2018170544 (ELSEY JUSTIN [AU]) [A] 1-3,8,11,12 * page 12, line 6; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US2015137426 (VAN ESBROECK HUBERTUS THEODORUS PETRUS [SG], et al) [A] 1-5, 16 * Entire document *; | [A]US2016059486 (DESIMONE JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 16 * Entire document *; | [A]US2017173872 (MCCALL WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 16* Entire document *; | [A]US2017297102 (CHIN RICARDO [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 16 * Entire document *; | [XA]US2017355132 (MOORE DAVID [US]) [X] 1-2, 5/(1-2) * Entire document, especially, Abstract, para [0007]; [0012]-[0015]; [0062]; [0082]; [0086]; [0089]; [0093]; [0123]; [0160] * [A] 3-4, 5/(3-4), 16 |