EP3933120 - WORK MACHINE OPERATION MECHANISM, AND WORK MACHINE PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | For all designated states ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD. 3-100 Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/40] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | ||
For all designated states ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD. 3-100 Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | |||
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyoflex Corporation 9th Floor, S-TEC Joho Building 24-1 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI Hitoshi c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD., 2-1 Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 02 /
SAIKI Seiji c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD., 2-1 Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 03 /
YAMAZAKI Yoichiro c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD., 2-1 Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMIZO Kohei c/o Toyoflex Corporation, 9th Floor, S-TEC Joho Building, 24-1, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku- ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | [2023/32] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
SASAKI Hitoshi Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | ||
02 /
SAIKI Seiji Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAZAKI Yoichiro Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKAMIZO Kohei Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20785234.4 | 06.02.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020JP04655 | Priority number, date | JP20190072113 | 04.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019072113 | [2022/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020202783 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3933120 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3933120 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, G05G1/30, E02F9/16, F16H19/02, F16H19/08, G05G1/01 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
E02F9/205 (EP,US);
E02F9/2004 (EP,US);
E02F9/16 (EP);
E02F9/2079 (EP);
G05G1/01 (US);
G05G7/10 (US);
E02F9/2087 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | E02F9/20, G05G1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSMECHANISMUS FÜR ARBEITSMASCHINEN UND DAMIT VERSEHENE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2022/01] | English: | WORK MACHINE OPERATION MECHANISM, AND WORK MACHINE PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2022/01] | French: | MÉCANISME DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL ET MACHINE DE TRAVAIL DOTÉE DE CELUI-CI | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2021 | Translation filed | 29.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SI | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1150493 (KAJIMA CORP) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]JP2000038744 (TOA HARBOR WORKS CO LTD, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]KR20120052671 (IUCF HYU [KR]) [X] 1-6,9 * figures 1-6 *; | [X]JP2019044352 (IHI CORP) [X] 1-6,9 * figures 6,7 * | International search | [Y]JPS5542330B [Y] 1-3, 6-9; | [Y]JPS62145134U [Y] 1-3, 6-9; | [Y]JPH0880887 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 5-9; | [Y]JPH10252102 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD) [Y] 1-9; | [A]JP2000186582 (KOMATSU FORKLIFT)[A] 1-9; | [Y]JP2005330771 (KUBOTA KK) [Y] 2, 4-9; | [Y]KR20120052671 (IUCF HYU [KR]) [Y] 1-9 | by applicant | JP2017172174 |