EP3930042 - ELECTRICITY STORAGE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GS Yuasa International Ltd. 1, Inobaba-cho, Nishinosho Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIKAWA, Tomoya c/o GS Yuasa International Ltd., 1, Inobaba-cho Nishinosho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
TSUCHIKAWA, Tomoya Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20785400.1 | 23.03.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020JP12642 | Priority number, date | JP20190068528 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019068528 | [2021/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203400 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3930042 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/36, H01G11/24, H01G11/52, H01M10/052, H01G11/26, H01M50/417, H01M10/0525, H01M50/451, H01M50/489, H01M50/431, H01M50/443, // H01M4/587, H01M4/525 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H01G11/24 (EP,US);
H01M4/364 (US);
H01G11/26 (EP);
H01G11/52 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M50/417 (EP);
H01M50/431 (EP,US);
H01M50/443 (EP,US);
H01M50/451 (EP);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M4/525 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | H01M4/13, H01M4/36, H01G11/24, H01G11/52, H01M10/052, H01M2/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | STROMSPEICHERELEMENT | [2021/52] | English: | ELECTRICITY STORAGE ELEMENT | [2021/52] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE STOCKAGE D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2021 | Translation filed | 21.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014004400 (UEKI TOMOYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6* claims 1, 4, 5 *; | [Y]US2014322586 (LEE JOO-SUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1, 8, 11, 19 *; | [X]US2015221944 (UEBO YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * claims 1, 2, 9, 16 * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0028] - [0033] , [0043] , [0056] , [0057] *; | [X]JP2018055801 (GS YUASA CORP) [X] 1-6 * claims 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0012] - [0043] - [0075] - [0080] *; | [Y]US2018233726 (NAGAO YU [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-3, 9 * | International search | [A]JP2016048668 (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-6; | [A]JP2017123269 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-6; | [A]JP2019029205 (PANASONIC CORP)[A] 1-6 | by applicant | JP2013254639 |