EP3950068 - REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROMIC COMPOSITION, REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROMIC MICROCAPSULE PIGMENT COMPRISING SAME, AND WRITING INSTRUMENT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PILOT INK CO., LTD. 17, Midori-cho 3-chome Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-8588 / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Pilot Corporation (also trading as Pilot Corporation) 2-6-21 Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8304 / JP | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEMOTO, Hiroshi c/o The Pilot Ink Co., Ltd., 17, Midori-cho 3- chome, Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-8588 / JP | 02 /
MORIGAKI, Yui c/o The Pilot Ink Co., Ltd., 17, Midori-cho 3- chome, Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-8588 / JP | 03 /
MASUSHIGE, Naoto c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Pilot Corporation, 6-21, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8304 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
UMEMOTO, Hiroshi Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIGAKI, Yui Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
MASUSHIGE, Naoto Tokyo 104-8304 / JP | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20785411.8 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP13524 | Priority number, date | JP20190067303 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019067303 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020203603 | Date: | 08.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950068 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/02, C08K9/10, C08L101/00, C09D11/037, A61K8/49, C09B11/28, C09B67/20, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/70, C08K5/00, C09D11/18, C09D11/17, C09D11/50, C08K5/1545 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
C09D11/17 (EP,KR,US);
C09B11/28 (KR);
C09K9/02 (US);
A61K8/347 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/49 (KR);
A61K8/498 (EP);
A61K8/70 (EP);
A61Q1/02 (EP,KR);
B43K7/00 (KR,US);
B43K8/02 (KR);
C08K9/10 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C09B11/24 (US);
C09B67/0097 (US);
C09D11/037 (KR);
C09D11/18 (EP,US);
C09D11/50 (EP,US);
A61K2800/438 (EP);
B43K19/00 (US);
B43K8/022 (US);
C08K5/0041 (EP);
C08K5/1545 (EP);
C09K2211/1007 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | A61Q1/02, C08K9/10, C08L101/00, C09D11/037, A61K8/49, C09B11/28, C09B67/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROME ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, REVERSIBLES THERMOCHROMES MIKROKAPSELPIGMENT, DAS DIESE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHÄLT, UND SCHREIBUTENSIL DAMIT | [2022/06] | English: | REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROMIC COMPOSITION, REVERSIBLE THERMOCHROMIC MICROCAPSULE PIGMENT COMPRISING SAME, AND WRITING INSTRUMENT USING SAME | [2022/06] | French: | COMPOSITION THERMOCHROMIQUE RÉVERSIBLE, PIGMENT THERMOCHROMIQUE RÉVERSIBLE EN MICROCAPSULE LA COMPRENANT, ET INSTRUMENT D'ÉCRITURE L'UTILISANT | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2021 | Translation filed | 13.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2002801 (YAMADA CHEM CO) [X] 1-13,16 * claims; examples *; | [X]JP2005139242 (RICOH KK) [X] 1,3,7,8 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038]; examples 4-6 ** paragraphs [0009] - [0020] * | International search | [X]JPH04193583 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-2, 4-6, 9-22; | [X]JPH05262034 [X] 1-22; | [X]JPH07113055 (SLIONTEC KK) [X] 1-2, 5, 9-11, 17-22; | [X]WO2005121072 (PILOT CORP ALSO TRADING AS PIL [JP], et al)[X] 1-2, 9-11, 16; | [X]JP2007216514 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD, et al) [X] 1-2, 5, 9-11, 16 | by applicant | JPS5144706 | JPS5144706B | JPS5144707B | JP2002294096 | JP2003253149 | JP2005001369 | JP2014005422 | JP2018123203 |