EP3895958 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING TRAIN INTERFACE DATA OF HOT-STANDBY VEHICLE-MOUNTED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRSC RESEARCH & DESIGN INSTITUTE GROUP CO., LTD. Block No. 1, Qichebowuguan Nanlu Fengtai Science Park Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Xiaona Block No. 1 Qichebowuguan Nanlu Fengtai Science Park Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jianmin Block No. 1 Qichebowuguan Nanlu Fengtai Science Park Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Zhiqiang Block No. 1 Qichebowuguan Nanlu Fengtai Science Park Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Youbing Block No. 1 Qichebowuguan Nanlu Fengtai Science Park Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Huang, Liwei Cäcilienstraße 12 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 20785425.8 | 17.08.2020 | [2021/42] | WO2020CN109451 | Priority number, date | CN202010149479 | 06.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010149479 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021174769 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895958 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3895958 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B61L27/00, B61L3/00, B61L15/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
B61L15/0063 (EP,CN);
B61L15/0072 (EP,CN);
B61L15/0081 (EP);
B61L15/0062 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | H04L12/40 | ||
Former IPC [2021/42] | B61L27/00, B61L3/00, B61L15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON ZUGSCHNITTSTELLENDATEN EINES HOT-STANDBY-BORDGERÄTS | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING TRAIN INTERFACE DATA OF HOT-STANDBY VEHICLE-MOUNTED DEVICE | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES D'INTERFACE DE TRAIN DE DISPOSITIF EMBARQUÉ EN RÉSERVE INSTANTANÉE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2020 | Translation filed | 10.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 24.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | IE | 17.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007168710 (BLEVINS JOSEPH S SR [US]) [A] 6,7 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2010280683 (MIYAUCHI TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1,2 *; | [XAI]CN109946956 (BEIJING NAT RAILWAY RES & DESIGN INST SIGNAL & COMMUNICATION LTD) [X] 1-6,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0065] * [A] 7,8 [I] 10; | [A]CN110380915 (HUNAN CRRC TIMES COMMUNICATION SIGNALS CO LTD) [A] 2,3 * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0138] *; | [A]WO2020014692 (AMSTED RAIL CO INC [US]) [A] 10* paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0126] * |