EP4028646 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH CAMSHAFT VALVE PHASE VARIATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piaggio & C. S.P.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera Pisa / IT | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARIOTTI, Walter c/o Piaggio & C. S.p.A Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera / IT | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Savi, Massimiliano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20786044.6 | 11.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020IB58451 | Priority number, date | IT20190016271 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: IT201900016271 | [2022/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021048801 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028646 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4028646 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/02, F01L1/344, F01L1/047, F01L1/26, F01L1/053 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
F01L1/02 (EP,CN,US);
F01L1/053 (EP,CN,US);
F01L1/344 (EP,CN,US);
F01L1/022 (EP,CN,US);
F01L1/026 (EP,CN,US);
F01L1/047 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT NOCKENWELLENVENTIL-PHASENÄNDERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/37] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH CAMSHAFT VALVE PHASE VARIATION DEVICE | [2022/29] | French: | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE VARIATION DE PHASE DES SOUPAPES DE L'ARBRE À CAMES | [2023/37] |
Former [2022/29] | VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR MIT NOCKENWELLENVENTILPHASENVERSTELLER | ||
Former [2022/29] | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE VARIATION DE PHASE DE SOUPAPE D'ARBRE À CAMES | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 31.01.2024 | |
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 30.04.2024 | |
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [IY]US4955330 (FABI CHRISTIAN [CA], et al) [I] 1,2,5-9 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 27; figure - * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]US5181485 (HIROSE ICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4* figures 2,5,6 *; | [I]US2008283010 (BOHNER JURGEN [DE], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0044] - [0065]; figure - *; | [IA]JP2009185656 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [I] 1,2,5,7,8 * abstract * [A] 3,4; | [A]EP3511538 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | DE10042041 |